Navratil v. Menard, Inc.

Plaintiff: Seth L Navratil and Seth L. Navratil
Defendant: Menard, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2019cv00009
Filed: January 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
0 Judge: Susan M Bazis
1 Judge: John M Gerrard
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Serving Defendant's Discovery Requests by Attorney Robert W. Futhey on behalf of Defendant Menard, Inc. (Futhey, Robert)
March 5, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of of Service of Discovery Requests by Attorney Erik W. Fern on behalf of Plaintiff Seth L. Navratil (Fern, Erik)
March 5, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosures by Attorney Erik W. Fern on behalf of Plaintiff Seth L. Navratil (Fern, Erik)
February 28, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Serving Defendant's Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures by Attorney Robert W. Futhey on behalf of Defendant Menard, Inc. (Futhey, Robert)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 FINAL PROGRESSION ORDER - The deposition deadline is November 1, 2019 for experts, 30 days before trial for any witness needed to lay foundation for documents and records, and August 1, 2019 for all other witnesses. A telephonic conference to discuss the status of case progression and the parties' interest in settlement will be held with the undersigned magistrate judge on June 18, 2019 at 3:00 p.m. by telephone. Counsel shall use the conferencing instructions assigned to this case to participate in the conference. The Pretrial Conference is scheduled to be held before the undersigned magistrate judge on February 13, 2020 at 11:00 a.m., and will be conducted by internet/telephonic conferencing. Counsel shall use the conferencing instructions assigned to this case to participate in the conference. The jury trial of this case is set to commence before John M. Gerrard, Chief United States District Judge, in the Special Proceedings Courtroom, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, Nebraska, at 9:00 a.m. on March 9, 2020, or as soon thereafter as the case may be called, for a duration of four (4) trial days. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (KLF)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 RESTRICTED CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (KLF)
February 12, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of F.R. CIV. P. 26(f) Memorandum and Scheduling Order by Attorney Erik W. Fern on behalf of Plaintiff Seth L. Navratil (Fern, Erik)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER - Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 2/19/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (KLF)
January 16, 2019 Filing 5 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint with with jury demand and Affirmative Defenses by Menard, Inc. (Futhey, Robert)
January 14, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Robert W. Futhey on behalf of Defendant Menard, Inc..(Futhey, Robert)
January 11, 2019 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Menard, Inc. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (KMM)
January 9, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Chief Judge John M. Gerrard and Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LKO)
January 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand against Seth L Navratil from Lancaster County District Court, Case number 18-4112 ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-3838458) with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney Robert W. Futhey on behalf of Menard, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Futhey, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Navratil v. Menard, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menard, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel J. Gutman
Represented By: Robert W. Futhey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Seth L Navratil
Represented By: Erik W. Fern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Seth L. Navratil
Represented By: Erik W. Fern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?