Johnson et al v. Big Ox Energy, LLC
Plaintiff: Gary Johnson and Sara Blum
Defendant: Big Ox Energy, LLC
Case Number: 8:2019cv00010
Filed: January 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Susan M Bazis
Referring Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
2 Judge: John M Gerrard
3 Judge: Cheryl R Zwart
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2019 Filing 18 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent Environmental Energy Capital, LLC, Corporate Parent Environmental Energy Capital, LLC, Corporate Parent TUSA Capital, LLC, Corporate Parent TUSA Capital, LLC, Corporate Parent NLC Energy-Big Ox, LLC, Corporate Parent NLC Energy-Big Ox, LLC, Corporate Parent NLC Energy Venture 30, LLC, Corporate Parent NLC Energy Venture 30, LLC, Corporate Parent RRCK Holdings, LLC, Corporate Parent RRCK Holdings, LLC, Corporate Parent Net Lease Capital Energy, LLC, Corporate Parent Net Lease Capital Energy, LLC for Big Ox Energy, LLC. by Attorney Dan H. Ketcham on behalf of Defendants Big Ox Energy, LLC, Environmental Energy Capital, LLC, Environmental Energy Capital, LLC, TUSA Capital, LLC, TUSA Capital, LLC, NLC Energy-Big Ox, LLC, NLC Energy-Big Ox, LLC, NLC Energy Venture 30, LLC, NLC Energy Venture 30, LLC, RRCK Holdings, LLC, RRCK Holdings, LLC, Net Lease Capital Energy, LLC, Net Lease Capital Energy, LLC.(Ketcham, Dan)
February 21, 2019 Filing 17 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Big Ox Energy, LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (KMM)
February 19, 2019 Filing 16 BRIEF in support of MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM #15 by Attorney Dan H. Ketcham on behalf of Defendant Big Ox Energy, LLC.(Ketcham, Dan)
February 19, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Attorney Dan H. Ketcham on behalf of Defendant Big Ox Energy, LLC.(Ketcham, Dan)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. On or before February 19, 2019, Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' complaint. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
February 1, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Dan H. Ketcham on behalf of Defendant Big Ox Energy, LLC.(Ketcham, Dan)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 REASSIGNMENT ORDER - that this case is reassigned to Chief District Judge John M. Gerrard for disposition and to Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart for judicial supervision. Ordered by Chief Judge John M. Gerrard. (LAC)
January 18, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Big Ox Energy, LLC on 1/15/2019. (Stahle, Robert)
January 15, 2019 Filing 10 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #9 for attorney Steven D. Liddle. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (KMG)
January 15, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-3843533 by Attorney Steven D. Liddle on behalf of Plaintiffs Sara Blum, Gary Johnson.(Liddle, Steven)
January 15, 2019 Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #7 for attorney Nicholas A. Coulson. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (KMG)
January 15, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-3843442 by Attorney Nicholas A. Coulson on behalf of Plaintiffs Sara Blum, Gary Johnson.(Coulson, Nicholas)
January 10, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to defendant Big Ox Energy, LLC. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LKO)
January 10, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Requested as to Big Ox Energy, LLC regarding Complaint, #1 . (Stahle, Robert)
January 9, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Steven D. Liddle has not registered for admittance to practice or registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LKO)
January 9, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Nicholas A. Coulson has not registered for admittance to practice or registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LKO)
January 9, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Senior Judge Laurie Smith Camp and Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LKO)
January 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Big Ox Energy, LLC, with receipt number ANEDC-3838501 in the amount of $400 by Attorney Robert J. Stahle on behalf of Gary Johnson and Sara Blum (Stahle, Robert) Modified on 1/9/2019 to add receipt information (LKO).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson et al v. Big Ox Energy, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Johnson
Represented By: Nicholas A. Coulson
Represented By: Steven D. Liddle
Represented By: Robert J. Stahle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sara Blum
Represented By: Nicholas A. Coulson
Represented By: Steven D. Liddle
Represented By: Robert J. Stahle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Big Ox Energy, LLC
Represented By: Dan H. Ketcham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?