Taylor v. University of Nebraska College of Education and Human Services et al

Plaintiff: Kim Taylor
Defendant: University of Nebraska College of Education and Human Sciences, University of Nebraska International Quilt Study Center & Museum, Carolyn Ducey and Leslie Levy
Case Number: 8:2019cv00019
Filed: January 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
0 Judge: Susan M Bazis
1 Judge: Robert F Rossiter
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2019 Filing 18 BRIEF in support of MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM #17 by Attorney Bren H. Chambers on behalf of Defendants Carolyn Ducey, Leslie Levy, University of Nebraska College of Education and Human Sciences, University of Nebraska International Quilt Study Center & Museum.(Chambers, Bren)
March 15, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Attorney Bren H. Chambers on behalf of Defendants Carolyn Ducey, Leslie Levy, University of Nebraska College of Education and Human Sciences, University of Nebraska International Quilt Study Center & Museum.(Chambers, Bren)
February 4, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon Defendent Carolyn Ducey defendant Carolyn Ducey on 1/28/2019. (Waggoner, Elaine)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER granting #14 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the amended complaint by March 15, 2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRH)
January 30, 2019 Filing 14 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Bren H. Chambers on behalf of Defendants Carolyn Ducey, Leslie Levy, University of Nebraska College of Education and Human Sciences, University of Nebraska International Quilt Study Center & Museum.(Chambers, Bren)
January 29, 2019 Filing 13 RETURN of service of Defendant, Leslie Levy on 01/25/2019 upon Defendant, Leslie Levy by Attorney Elaine A. Waggoner on behalf of Plaintiff Kim Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Sumons Returned Executed)(Waggoner, Elaine)
January 29, 2019 Filing 12 RETURN of service of Defendant, University of Nebraska on 01/25/2019 upon Douglas Peterson, State Attorney General by Attorney Elaine A. Waggoner on behalf of Plaintiff Kim Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Summons Returned Executed)(Waggoner, Elaine)
January 22, 2019 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to defendants Carolyn Ducey, Leslie Levy, and University of Nebraska College of Education and Human Sciences. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (KLF)
January 22, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Requested as to Leslie Levy regarding Amended Complaint #7 . (Waggoner, Elaine)
January 22, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Requested as to State of Nebraska Attorney General regarding Amended Complaint #7 . (Waggoner, Elaine)
January 22, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Requested as to Carolyn Ducey regarding Amended Complaint #7 . (Waggoner, Elaine)
January 18, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT with with jury demand Plaintiff, Kim Taylor against Defendant All Defendants, by Attorney Elaine A. Waggoner on behalf of Kim Taylor(Waggoner, Elaine)
January 16, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Requested as to Carlyn Ducey regarding Complaint #1 . (Waggoner, Elaine)
January 16, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Requested as to State of Nebraska Attorney General regarding Complaint #1 . (Waggoner, Elaine)
January 16, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LKO)
January 16, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Requested as to Leslie Levy regarding Complaint #1 . (Waggoner, Elaine)
January 16, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Cover Sheet by Attorney Elaine A. Waggoner on behalf of Plaintiff Kim Taylor.(Waggoner, Elaine)
January 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand Plaintiff, Kim Taylor against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-3844860), by Attorney Elaine A. Waggoner on behalf of Kim Taylor(Waggoner, Elaine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. University of Nebraska College of Education and Human Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Nebraska College of Education and Human Sciences
Represented By: Bren H. Chambers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Nebraska International Quilt Study Center & Museum
Represented By: Bren H. Chambers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn Ducey
Represented By: Bren H. Chambers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leslie Levy
Represented By: Bren H. Chambers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim Taylor
Represented By: Elaine A. Waggoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?