Union Pacific Railroad Company v. International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail, and Transportation Workers (SMART) - Transportation Division
Plaintiff: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Defendant: SMART, International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers and International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail, and Transportation Workers (SMART) - Transportation Division
Case Number: 8:2019cv00031
Filed: January 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Referring Judge: Michael D Nelson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Railway Labor Act
Cause of Action: 45:151
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed upon defendant International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail, and Transportation Workers (SMART) - Transportation Division. Waiver sent on 1/23/2019. (Pittler, Alan)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER - The parties' Stipulation for Consolidation (Filing No. 13 in Case No. 8:19CV50) is granted. The above-captioned cases are consolidated for all purposes. The Court designates Case No. 8:19CV31 as the "Lead Case" and Case No. 8:19CV50 as the "Member Case." The Court's CM/ECF System has the capacity for "spreading" text among the consolidated cases. If properly docketed, the documents filed in the Lead Case will automatically be filed in the Member Case. The parties are instructed to file documents in the Lead Case and to select the option "yes" in response to the System's question whether to spread the text. The parties may not use the spread text feature to file complaints, amended complaints, and answers; to pay filing fees electronically using pay.gov; or to file items related to service of process. If a party believes an item in addition to those described in paragraph 3 should not be filed in all the consolidated cases, the party must move for permission to file the item in the Member Case. The motion must be filed in both the consolidated cases using the spread text feature. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (LKO)
January 28, 2019 Filing 9 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #7 for attorney Joseph P. Sirbak, II. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (KMG)
January 28, 2019 Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #6 for attorney Alan J. Pittler. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (KMG)
January 26, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-3852563 by Attorney Joseph P. Sirbak, II on behalf of Plaintiff Union Pacific Railroad Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sirbak, Joseph)
January 26, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-3852559 by Attorney Alan M. Pittler on behalf of Plaintiff Union Pacific Railroad Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pittler, Alan)
January 24, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Alan M. Pittler has not registered for admittance to practice or registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LKO)
January 24, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Joseph P. Sirbak has not registered for admittance to practice or registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LKO)
January 24, 2019 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Senior Judge Laurie Smith Camp and Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LKO)
January 23, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent Union Pacific Corporation for Union Pacific Railroad Company. by Attorney Ryan D. Wilkins on behalf of Plaintiffs Union Pacific Railroad Company, Union Pacific Corporation.(Wilkins, Ryan)
January 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Petition to Vacate against SMART, International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-3849547), by Attorney Ryan D. Wilkins on behalf of Union Pacific Railroad Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wilkins, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Union Pacific Railroad Company v. International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail, and Transportation Workers (SMART) - Transportation Division
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SMART, International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail, and Transportation Workers (SMART) - Transportation Division
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Represented By: Ryan D. Wilkins
Represented By: Alan M. Pittler
Represented By: Joseph P. Sirbak, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?