Selegrath et al v. Ma & Pa Trucking, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Faith Selegrath, Bobby Selegrath and Bobby Selegrath, Jr
Defendant: Ma & Pa Trucking, LLC and Sy Francis Koppen
Case Number: 8:2019cv00037
Filed: January 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Susan M Bazis
Referring Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2019 Filing 11 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Attorney Matthew G. Miller on behalf of Plaintiffs Bobby Selegrath, Bobby Selegrath, Jr, Faith Selegrath.(Miller, Matthew)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LKO)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER - Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 3/25/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LKO)
February 18, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Sy Francis Koppen, Ma & Pa Trucking, LLC (Lindstrom, Daniel)
February 4, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Sy Francis Koppen on 1/31/2019. (Miller, Matthew)
February 4, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Ma & Pa Trucking, LLC on 1/28/2019. (Miller, Matthew)
January 25, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to defendants Sy Francis Koppen and Ma & Pa Trucking, LLC. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LKO)
January 25, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Requested as to Ma & Pa Trucking, LLC regarding Complaint #1 . (Miller, Matthew)
January 25, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Requested as to Sy Francis Koppen regarding Complaint #1 . (Miller, Matthew)
January 25, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Senior Judge Laurie Smith Camp and Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LKO)
January 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-3852136), by Attorney Matthew G. Miller on behalf of Bobby Selegrath, Faith Selegrath, Bobby Selegrath, Jr(Miller, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Selegrath et al v. Ma & Pa Trucking, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ma & Pa Trucking, LLC
Represented By: Nicholas R. Norton
Represented By: Daniel L. Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sy Francis Koppen
Represented By: Nicholas R. Norton
Represented By: Daniel L. Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Faith Selegrath
Represented By: Matthew G. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby Selegrath
Represented By: Matthew G. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby Selegrath, Jr
Represented By: Matthew G. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?