Mumin v. Condon et al

Plaintiff: Dukhan Mumin
Defendant: Patrick Condon and Doug Peterson
Case Number: 8:2019cv00060
Filed: February 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
0 Judge: Pro Se Docket
1 Judge: Richard G Kopf
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 JUDGMENT - PRO SE regarding Memorandum and Order #9 . This case is dismissed without prejudice for the reasons set forth in the corresponding Memorandum and Order entered on this date. Any notice of appeal filed by Plaintiff Dukhan Mumin must be accompanied by the $505.00 appellate filing fee because Plaintiff will not be allowed to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal. (Attachments: #1 Notice - Civil Appeals in Pro Se Cases) Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (SLP)
March 20, 2019 Filing 11 TEXT STRIKE ORDER that Pursuant to NEGenR 1.3(a)(4), the Judgment - Pro Se, #10 is stricken for the following reason(s): empty PDF document attached. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (SLP)
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STRICKEN JUDGMENT - PRO SE regarding Memorandum and Order #9 . This case is dismissed without prejudice for the reasons set forth in the corresponding Memorandum and Order entered on this date. Any notice of appeal filed by Plaintiff Dukhan Mumin must be accompanied by the $505.00 appellate filing fee because Plaintiff will not be allowed to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (SLP). Modified on 3/20/2019 to strike (SLP).
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's Motions for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis filings #2 and #7 are denied. This case is dismissed without prejudice and a separate judgment will be entered in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. Any notice of appeal filed by Plaintiff must be accompanied by the $505.00 appellate filing fee because Plaintiff will not be allowed to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(SLP)
February 22, 2019 Filing 8 PRISONER ACCOUNT CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Dukhan Mumin. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). (LAC)
February 19, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis on behalf of Plaintiff Dukhan Mumin. (LAC)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER regarding MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis #2 filed by Dukhan Mumin. Plaintiff has 30 days to either show cause for why this case should not be dismissed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(g) or pay the court's $400.00 filing and administrative fees. The clerk's office is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this matter with the following text: March 11, 2019: deadline for Plaintiff to show cause or pay fees. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(SLP)
February 5, 2019 Filing 5 LETTER by Clerk requesting plaintiff's trust account statement from institution. (LAC)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 GENERAL ORDER NO. 2016-02: This general order provides for the management and assignment of cases filed by a plaintiff or petitioner without counsel. This general order also includes the definition of the pro se docket, responsibilities of the pro se law clerks and scheduling and discovery requirements in pro se cases. Ordered by Senior Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LAC)
February 5, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Clerk acknowledging receipt of complaint filed by a pro se party. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LAC)
February 4, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis on behalf of Plaintiff Dukhan Mumin. (LAC)
February 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Patrick Condon and Doug Peterson filed on behalf of pro se plaintiff Dukhan Mumin. (LAC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mumin v. Condon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Condon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doug Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dukhan Mumin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?