Williams v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al

Plaintiff: Jerrica R Williams and Jerrica R. Williams
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. and Wells Fargo & Company
Case Number: 8:2019cv00061
Filed: February 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Susan M Bazis
Referring Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 05:7703
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 JUDGMENT - The Motion to Compel Arbitration, ECF No. #12 , filed by Defendants Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., and Wells Fargo & Company, is granted. This action is dismissed, without prejudice. Ordered by Senior Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (LKO)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The Motion to Compel Arbitration, ECF No. #12 , filed by Defendants Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., and Wells Fargo & Company, is granted. This action is dismissed, without prejudice. A separate judgment will be entered. Ordered by Senior Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (LKO)
March 4, 2019 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent Wells Fargo & Company, Corporate Parent Wells Fargo & Company, Other Affiliate Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Other Affiliate Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. for Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. by Attorney Ross W. Johnson on behalf of Defendants Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A..(Johnson, Ross)
March 4, 2019 Filing 14 DECLARATION regarding Brief, #13 by Attorney Ross W. Johnson on behalf of Defendants Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Johnson, Ross)
March 4, 2019 Filing 13 BRIEF in support of MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss, or in the Alternative, Stay Pending Completion of Arbitration Proceedings #12 by Attorney Ross W. Johnson on behalf of Defendants Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A..(Johnson, Ross)
March 4, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss, or in the Alternative, Stay Pending Completion of Arbitration Proceedings by Attorney Ross W. Johnson on behalf of Defendants Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A..(Johnson, Ross)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 REASSIGNMENT ORDER - that this case is reassigned to Senior District Judge Laurie Smith Camp for disposition and remains assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis for judicial supervision. Ordered by Chief Judge John M. Gerrard. (LKO)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER OF RECUSAL REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT - This matter is before the court on the court's own motion pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 455(a), which states: "Any... judge... of the United States shall disqualify himself in any proceeding in which his impartiality might reasonably be questioned." Upon review of the parties and the record in the above-designated case, the undersigned judge shall, and hereby does, recuse himself from the above-designated case pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 455(a). Ordered by Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr.. (LKO)
February 15, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. on 2/11/2019. (McNamara, Patrick)
February 15, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Wells Fargo & Company on 2/11/2019. (McNamara, Patrick)
February 8, 2019 Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting Application for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically #6 . The payor inadvertently paid the filing fee twice. Filing fee in the amount of $400.00 is refunded to the payor, Patrick E. McNamara, receipt number ANEDC-3863075. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (DKM)
February 7, 2019 Filing 6 APPLICATION for Refund of filing fee paid electronically by Attorney Patrick E. McNamara on behalf of Plaintiff Jerrica R. Williams.(McNamara, Patrick)
February 7, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to defendants Wells Fargo & Company and Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LKO)
February 7, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Requested as to regarding Complaint #1 . (McNamara, Patrick)
February 7, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Requested as to regarding Complaint #1 . (McNamara, Patrick)
February 7, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LKO)
February 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number BNEDC-3863075), by Attorney Patrick E. McNamara on behalf of Jerrica R Williams(McNamara, Patrick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Ross W. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo & Company
Represented By: Ross W. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerrica R Williams
Represented By: Patrick E. McNamara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerrica R. Williams
Represented By: Patrick E. McNamara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?