Acosta v. Tokyo Sushi Omaha, LLC et al

Plaintiff: R. Alexander Acosta
Defendant: Tokyo Sushi Omaha, LLC and Kong Shun ("Randy") Gao
Case Number: 8:2019cv00064
Filed: February 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Bataillon
Referring Judge: Michael D Nelson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CONSENT JUDGMENT - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that Defendants, their officers, agents, servants, employees, and those persons in active concert or participation with them who receive actual notice of this Judgment, are hereby permanently enjoined and restrained from violation the provisions of 29 U.S.C. 215(a)(2) and 215(a)(5) of the Fair Labor Standards Act of 1938, as amended (29 U.S.C. 201 et seq., hereinafter the "FLSA"). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED: Judgment is hereby entered, pursuant to Section 16(c) of the FLSA, 29 U.S.C. 216, in favor of the Secretary and against Defendants, jointly and severally, in the total amount of $91,874 which includes $45,937 in unpaid overtime and minimum wage compensation due the employees identified in Exhibit A, attached hereto, plus an additional amount of $45,937 as statutorily authorized liquated damages due to said employees. Each party shall bear their own costs, fees and other expenses incurred by such party in connection with any stage of this proceeding. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (TCL)
February 14, 2019 Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #5 for attorney Jian Hang. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (KMG)
February 13, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-3868732 by Attorney Jian Hang on behalf of Defendants Kong Shun ("Randy") Gao, Tokyo Sushi Omaha, LLC.(Hang, Jian)
February 12, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Jian Hang has not registered for admittance to practice nor registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (ADB)
February 11, 2019 Filing 3 JOINT MOTION for Judgment by Attorney Charles W. Gordon, Jr on behalf of Plaintiff R. Alexander Acosta. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Consent Judgment, #2 Exhibit A)(Gordon, Charles)
February 11, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon and Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LKO)
February 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, by Attorney Charles W. Gordon, Jr on behalf of R. Alexander Acosta (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gordon, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Acosta v. Tokyo Sushi Omaha, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R. Alexander Acosta
Represented By: Charles W. Gordon, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tokyo Sushi Omaha, LLC
Represented By: Jian Hang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kong Shun ("Randy") Gao
Represented By: Jian Hang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?