Aya Healthcare Services, Inc. et al v. AMN Healthcare, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Aya Healthcare Services, Inc. and Aya Healthcare, Inc.
Defendant: AMN Services, LLC., AMN Healthcare, Inc., AMN Healthcare Service, Inc., MEDEFIS, Inc. and Shiftwise, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2019cv00075
Filed: February 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Susan M Bazis
Referring Judge: Robert F Rossiter
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - Plaintiffs' Notice of Application and Application for an Order to Show Cause Why Contempt Citation Should Not Issue (Filing No. #1 ) is denied. The Declaration offered in support of the Notice pertains to an entity referred to as "Triage Staffing." The Declaration does not mention OneStaff and does not properly support the Notice. Plaintiffs' Notice of Application and Application for an Order to Show Cause Why Contempt Citation Should Not Issue (Filing No. #3 ) is granted, in part. By May 10, 2019, OneStaff shall show cause as to why it should not be compelled to respond to the Subpoena referenced in this Order. Failure to comply with this Order could result in a recommendation to United States District Court Judge Robert Rossiter that OneStaff be held in contempt and ordered to immediately produce all documents requested in the Subpoena. Plaintiffs are directed to provide a copy of this Order to OneStaff and OneStaff's registered agent, via certified mail, return receipt requested. Plaintiffs shall thereafter file a certificate of service showing compliance with the Order. The certificate of service shall identify the name and address to whom the Order was sent, as well as the date the Order was mailed. Plaintiffs are further directed to provide a copy of this Order to counsel for Defendants in the underlying action in California. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LKO)
March 28, 2019 Filing 9 FINAL MOTION to Compel Response to Subpoena for Documents by Attorney Jason L. Eliaser on behalf of Plaintiffs Aya Healthcare Services, Inc., Aya Healthcare, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support, #2 Declaration in Support, #3 Proof of Service)(Eliaser, Jason)
February 21, 2019 Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #7 for attorney Jason L. Eliaser. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS)
February 20, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice ; Declaration of Jason Eliaser in Support Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-3872103 by Attorney Jason L. Eliaser on behalf of Plaintiffs Aya Healthcare Services, Inc., Aya Healthcare, Inc..(Eliaser, Jason)
February 14, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Jason Eliaser has not registered for admittance to practice or registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LKO)
February 14, 2019 Filing 5 Proof of Service by Attorney Jason Eliaser on behalf of Plaintiffs Aya Healthcare Services, Inc. and Aya Healthcare, Inc. (LKO)
February 14, 2019 Filing 4 DECLARATION in regards to filing #3 by Attorney Jason Eliaser on behalf of Plaintiffs Aya Healthcare Services, Inc. and Aya Healthcare, Inc. (LKO)
February 14, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPLICATION AND APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY CONTEMPT CITATION SHOULD NOT ISSUE by Attorney Jason Eliaser on behalf of Plaintiffs Aya Healthcare Services, Inc. and Aya Healthcare, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support) (LKO)
February 14, 2019 Filing 2 DECLARATION in regards to filing #1 by Attorney Jason Eliaser on behalf of Plaintiffs Aya Healthcare Services, Inc. and Aya Healthcare, Inc. (LKO)
February 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF APPLICATION AND APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY CONTEMPT CITATION SHOULD NOT ISSUE (with Receipt # 8050741) by Attorney Jason Eliaser on behalf of Plaintiffs Aya Healthcare Services, Inc. and Aya Healthcare, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support) (LKO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aya Healthcare Services, Inc. et al v. AMN Healthcare, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aya Healthcare Services, Inc.
Represented By: Jason Eliaser
Represented By: Jason L. Eliaser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aya Healthcare, Inc.
Represented By: Jason Eliaser
Represented By: Jason L. Eliaser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMN Services, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMN Healthcare, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMN Healthcare Service, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MEDEFIS, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shiftwise, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?