Alford v. Peterson et al
Case Number: 8:2019cv00179
Filed: April 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Declaratory Judgement

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - This case is dismissed with prejudice, and a separate judgment will be entered in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. Any notice of appeal filed by Plaintiff must be accompanied by the $505.00 appellate filing fee because Plaintiff will not be allowed to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (KLF)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the Plaintiff will have 30 days to show cause why this case should not be dismissed for failure to pay the initial partial filing fee. In the absence of cause shown, this case will be dismissed without prejudice and withou t further notice. The clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: July 29, 2019: response to show-cause order due. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(LAC)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed IFP (Filing Nos. 5 and 8 ) is granted. Plaintiff must pay an initial partial filing fee of $1.55 within 30 days, unless the court extends the time in which he has to pay in response to a wr itten motion. After payment of the initial partial filing fee, Plaintiff's institution must collect the additional monthly payments in the manner set forth in 28 U.S.C. § 1915(b)(2), quoted above, and forward those payments to the court. Th e clerk's office is directed to send a copy of this order to the appropriate official at Plaintiff's institution. The clerk's office is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: June 24, 2 019: initial partial filing fee payment due. Plaintiff is advised that, following payment of the initial partial filing fee, the next step in Plaintiff's case will be for the court to conduct an initial review of Plaintiff's claims to deter mine whether summary dismissal is appropriate under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2). The court will conduct this initial review in its normal course of business. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party and Plaintiff's institution; e-mailed to Finance) (KLF)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff is directed to submit the $400.00 fees to the clerk's office or submit a request to proceed in forma pauperis within 30 days. Failure to take either action will result in dismissal of this matter without fur ther notice. The clerk of the court is directed to send to Plaintiff the Form AO240 ("Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit"). The clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this matter with the following text: May 28, 2019: Check for MIFP or payment. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party along with Form AO240) (KLF)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alford v. Peterson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?