Fisher v. Montclair et al
Case Number: 8:2019cv00183
Filed: May 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - This matter is dismissed without prejudice because Plaintiff failed to prosecute it diligently and failed to comply with this court's orders. The court will enter judgment by a separate document. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. It is ordered that: (1) Plaintiff shall have until November 29, 2019, to file an amended complaint in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. Failure to file an amended complaint within the time specified by the court will re sult in the court dismissing this case without further notice to Plaintiff. If Plaintiff decides to file an amended complaint, Plaintiff must include all the claims he wishes to pursue against all the defendants he wishes to proceed against in the am ended complaint. Plaintiff should be mindful to explain in his amended complaint what each defendant did to him, when the defendant did it, how the defendant's actions harmed him, and what specific legal rights Plaintiff believes the defendant v iolated. Plaintiff is warned that an amended complaint will supersede, not supplement, his Complaint.(2) The court reserves the right to conduct further review of Plaintiff's claims pursuant to 28 U.S.C. section 1915(e) in the event he files an amended complaint. (3) The clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline using the following text: November 29, 2019: check for amended complaint. *** Set Pro Se Case Management Deadline for 11/29/2019 -- check for amended complaint. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed/e-mailed to pro se party)(KLL)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - that leave to proceed in forma pauperis is granted, and the Complaint shall be filed without payment of fees. Plaintiff is advised that the next step in his case will be for the court to conduct an initial review of his claims to determine whether summary dismissal is appropriate under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2). The court will conduct this initial review in its normal course of business. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(LKO)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fisher v. Montclair et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?