Boehm v. Livefree Emergency Response, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Andrew Boehm
Defendant: Internet Listing Solutions, LLC, T Wilson Investments LLC, Livefree Emergency Response, Inc. and Timothy Wilson
Case Number: 8:2019cv00208
Filed: May 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Susan M Bazis
Referring Judge: Robert F Rossiter
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:0251
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 5, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon Timothy Wilson, registered agent for defendant Internet Listing Solutions, LLC on 6/27/2019. (Javitch, Mark)
June 20, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to defendant Internet Listing Solutions, LLC. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LKO)
June 19, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Requested as to regarding Complaint #1 . (Javitch, Mark)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER that pursuant to the Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by the plaintiff Andrew Boehm (Filing No. #5 ) and pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i), defendant Livefree Emergency Response, Inc. is dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear its own fees, costs and expenses. Ordered by Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. (JSF)
June 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant LIVEFREE EMERGENCY RESPONSE, INC. by Attorney Mark L. Javitch on behalf of Plaintiff Andrew Boehm (Javitch, Mark)
May 10, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #2 for attorney Mark Javitch. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS)
May 10, 2019 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LKO)
May 9, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-3935956 by Attorney Mark L. Javitch on behalf of Plaintiff Andrew Boehm.(Javitch, Mark)
May 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-3935950), by Attorney Mark L. Javitch on behalf of Andrew Boehm (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Javitch, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boehm v. Livefree Emergency Response, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Internet Listing Solutions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T Wilson Investments LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Livefree Emergency Response, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Boehm
Represented By: Mark L. Javitch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?