United States of America v. Smithberg et al

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: The City of Plattsmouth, Nebraska, Katie L. Smithberg and Michael A. Smithberg
Case Number: 8:2019cv00216
Filed: May 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Referring Judge: Michael D Nelson
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 10 RETURN of service of Summons and Complaint on 06/28/2019 upon Katie L. Smithberg. (LAC)
July 1, 2019 Filing 9 RETURN of service of Summons and Complaint on 06/28/2019 upon Michael A. Smithberg. (LAC)
June 25, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by The City of Plattsmouth, Nebraska (Wright, Damien)
June 18, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to defendants Katie L. Smithberg and Michael A. Smithberg. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LKO)
June 18, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Requested as to Katie L. Smithberg regarding Complaint, #1 . (Homan, Robert)
June 18, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Requested as to Michael A. Smithberg regarding Complaint, #1 . (Homan, Robert)
May 28, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed upon defendant The City of Plattsmouth, Nebraska. Waiver sent on 5/15/2019. (Homan, Robert)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 REASSIGNMENT ORDER that due to clerical error, this case is reassigned to Senior District Judge Laurie Smith Camp for disposition and remains assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson for judicial supervision. Ordered by Chief Judge John M. Gerrard. (MBM)
May 15, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNED: Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LKO)
May 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Katie L. Smithberg, Michael A. Smithberg, The City of Plattsmouth, Nebraska, by Attorney Robert L. Homan on behalf of United States of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Promissory Note, #2 Exhibit B Mortgage for Nebraska, #3 Exhibit C Reamortization Agreement)(Homan, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Smithberg et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of Plattsmouth, Nebraska
Represented By: Damien J. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katie L. Smithberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael A. Smithberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Office of General Counsel USDA
Represented By: Robert L. Homan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?