Coutts v. Department of Correctional Services et al

Petitioner: James A. Coutts
Respondent: Scott White, Michelle Capps, Shane Monthey, Thomas G. Lieske, Scott Frakes, Department of Correctional Services, Kearney County Sheriff's Department, Cory Ziola, Justin Glanzer and State of Nebraska
Interested Party: Nebraska Attorney General
Case Number: 8:2019cv00218
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Referring Judge: Richard G Kopf
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Upon initial review of the habeas corpus petition (Filing No. #1 ), the court preliminarily determines that Petitioner's claims, as they are set forth in this Memorandum and Order, are potentially cognizable in federal court. By August 26, 2019, Respondent must file a motion for summary judgment or state court records in support of an answer. The clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: August 26, 2019: deadline for Respondent to file state court records in support of answer or motion for summary judgment. No discovery shall be undertaken without leave of the court. The clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: September 23, 2019: check for Respondent's answer and separate brief. See Rule 6 of the Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases in the United States District Courts. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(LKO)
July 3, 2019 Filing 10 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed on behalf of pro se petitioner James A. Coutts. (LKO)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The petition (filing no. #1 ) (including the attachment) is denied and dismissed without prejudice. The motions (filing no. #4 , filing no. #5 and filing no. #6 ) are denied. The petitioner shall have until July 8, 2019, to file a new petition using the official form. The petitioner is advised that the Clerk must be in receipt of the new petition by the foregoing date, as I have taken into account the prison mail box rule when setting this deadline. If a proper petition is not filed by that date, this entire matter may be dismissed without prejudice and without further notice. The Clerk shall mail to the petitioner a copy of this Memorandum and Order and two copies of the Petition Under 28 U.S.C. 2254 for a Writ of Habeas Corpus and one copy of the Complaint for Violation of Civil Rights (Prisoner). My chambers shall call this matter to my attention on July 9, 2019. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party with forms) (LKO)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER - Petitioner's Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (Filing No. #2 ) is granted. The next step in this case is for the court to conduct a preliminary review of the habeas corpus petition in accordance with Rule 4 of the Rules Governing Section 2254 cases. The court will conduct this review in its normal course of business. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed/e-mailed to pro se party)(LKO)
May 17, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE by Clerk acknowledging receipt of complaint filed by a pro se party. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO)
May 16, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Telephonic Hearing on behalf of Petitioner James A. Coutts. (LKO)
May 16, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Exhibits on behalf of Petitioner James A. Coutts. (LKO)
May 16, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Summons on behalf of Petitioner James A. Coutts. (LKO)
May 16, 2019 Filing 3 PRISONER ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Petitioner James A. Coutts. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). (LKO)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis on behalf of Petitioner James A. Coutts. (LKO)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed on behalf of pro se petitioner James A. Coutts. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(LKO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coutts v. Department of Correctional Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Scott White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Michelle Capps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Shane Monthey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Thomas G. Lieske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Scott Frakes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Department of Correctional Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kearney County Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Cory Ziola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Justin Glanzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of Nebraska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: James A. Coutts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Nebraska Attorney General
Represented By: Douglas J. Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?