Hillesheim v. Nebraska Furniture Mart, Inc.
Plaintiff: Zach Hillesheim
Defendant: Nebraska Furniture Mart, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2019cv00227
Filed: May 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: John M Gerrard
Referring Judge: Cheryl R Zwart
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway, Inc., Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway, Inc. for Nebraska Furniture Mart, Inc.. by Attorney Jarrod D. Reece on behalf of Defendants Nebraska Furniture Mart, Inc., Berkshire Hathaway, Inc., Berkshire Hathaway, Inc..(Reece, Jarrod)
June 14, 2019 Filing 7 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Nebraska Furniture Mart, Inc. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (KMM)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. Nebraska Furniture Mart, Inc. shall file its answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint by August 1, 2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JLA)
June 13, 2019 Filing 5 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Jarrod D. Reece on behalf of Defendant Nebraska Furniture Mart, Inc..(Reece, Jarrod)
May 21, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to defendant Nebraska Furniture Mart, Inc. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LKO)
May 21, 2019 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Chief Judge John M. Gerrard and Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LKO)
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Requested as to Nebraska Furniture Mart, Inc. regarding Complaint #1 . (Browne, Padraigin)
May 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nebraska Furniture Mart, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-3943141), by Attorney Padraigin L. Browne on behalf of Zach Hillesheim (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Browne, Padraigin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hillesheim v. Nebraska Furniture Mart, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zach Hillesheim
Represented By: Padraigin L. Browne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nebraska Furniture Mart, Inc.
Represented By: Jarrod D. Reece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?