Hillesheim v. Heritage Plaza LLC
Plaintiff: Zach Hillesheim
Defendant: Heritage Plaza LLC
Case Number: 8:2019cv00230
Filed: May 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Michael D Nelson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Edward F. Pohren on behalf of Defendant Heritage Plaza LLC.(Pohren, Edward)
June 27, 2019 Filing 12 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Heritage Plaza LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(ADB)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. Defendant shall have an extension of time to July 22, 2019, to file an answer or other responsive pleading to the Complaint. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (SMN)
June 26, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Edward F. Pohren on behalf of Defendant Heritage Plaza LLC.(Pohren, Edward)
June 26, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Edward F. Pohren on behalf of Defendant Heritage Plaza LLC (Pohren, Edward)
June 17, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Heritage Plaza LLC on 6/10/2019. (LAC)
May 23, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to defendant Heritage Plaza LLC d/b/a Heritage Plaza, a MO LLC. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LKO)
May 23, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Requested as to Heritage Plaza LLC d/b/a Heritage Plaza, a MO LLC regarding Complaint #1 . (Browne, Padraigin)
May 23, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to defendant Heritage Plaza LLC d/b/a Heritage Plaza, a MO LLC. (Browne, Padraigin)
May 23, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to defendant Heritage Plaza LLC d/b/a Heritage Plaza, a MO LLC. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LKO)
May 23, 2019 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNED: Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LKO)
May 23, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Requested as to Heritage Plaza LLC d/b/a Heritage Plaza, a MO LLC regarding Complaint #1 . (Browne, Padraigin)
May 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Heritage Plaza LLC d/b/a Heritage Plaza, a MO LLC ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-3944461), by Attorney Padraigin L. Browne on behalf of Zach Hillesheim (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Browne, Padraigin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hillesheim v. Heritage Plaza LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zach Hillesheim
Represented By: Padraigin L. Browne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heritage Plaza LLC
Represented By: Edward F. Pohren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?