Timothy L. Ashford, PC LLO et al v. Office for Counsel for Discipline et al
Plaintiff: Timothy L. Ashford, PC LLO and Timothy L. Ashford
Defendant: John Does 1-100, Mark A. Weber, Office for Counsel for Discipline and Jane Does 1-100
Case Number: 8:2019cv00243
Filed: June 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: John M Gerrard
Referring Judge: Cheryl R Zwart
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Filing 9 SCHEDULING LETTER from USCA - 8th Circuit (19-2618) as to Notice of Appeal to USCA #7 . (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter) (LKO)
July 29, 2019 Filing 8 NOTIFICATION OF APPEAL AND NOA SUPPLEMENT by Clerk to USCA regarding Notice of Appeal to USCA #7 . Notice of Appeal filed on 7/29/19 by Plaintiff Timothy L. Ashford. (LKO)
July 29, 2019 TEXT ENTRY THAT APPEAL fee paid with receipt number 8052780 in the amount of $505 regarding Notice of Appeal to USCA #7 . (LKO)
July 29, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEAL regarding Memorandum and Order #2 and Judgment #3 by Attorney Timothy L. Ashford on behalf of Plaintiff Timothy L. Ashford. Filing fee paid in the amount of $505, receipt #8052780. (LKO)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER: The plaintiffs' motion to alter or amend pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 59(e) is denied. Ordered by Chief Judge John M. Gerrard. (DCD)
July 1, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Reconsideration Memorandum by Attorney Timothy L. Ashford on behalf of Plaintiff Timothy L. Ashford. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Ashford, Timothy)
July 1, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Reconsideration by Attorney Timothy L. Ashford on behalf of Plaintiff Timothy L. Ashford.(Ashford, Timothy)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 JUDGMENT - Pursuant to the accompanying memorandum and order, the plaintiffs' complaint is dismissed. Ordered by Chief Judge John M. Gerrard. (LKO)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The plaintiffs' complaint is dismissed. A separate judgment will be entered. Ordered by Chief Judge John M. Gerrard. (LKO)
June 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Office for Counsel for Discipline, Mark A. Weber, Jane Does 1-100, John Does 1-100; No Summons(es) issued, with receipt number 8052094, in the amount of $ 400 by Attorney Timothy L. Ashford on behalf of Timothy L. Ashford, PC LLO, Timothy L. Ashford. (ADB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Timothy L. Ashford, PC LLO et al v. Office for Counsel for Discipline et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark A. Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office for Counsel for Discipline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy L. Ashford, PC LLO
Represented By: Timothy L. Ashford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy L. Ashford
Represented By: Timothy L. Ashford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?