Lyles v. Unum Life Insurance Company of America

Plaintiff: Michelle Lyles
Defendant: Unum Life Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 8:2019cv00248
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Referring Judge: Michael D Nelson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Service by Attorney Julie D. Tabor on behalf of Plaintiff Michelle Lyles (Tabor, Julie)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER granting #10 Motion to Extend. The Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline is extended to August 12, 2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (JLM)
July 23, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Extend Time to Submit Rule 26(f) Report by Attorney Steven D. Davidson on behalf of Defendant Unum Life Insurance Company of America.(Davidson, Steven)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (LKO)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER - Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 8/5/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (LKO)
July 2, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Notice of Removal Complaint regarding: Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint, #1 by Unum Life Insurance Company of America (Davidson, Steven)
June 18, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent Unum Group for Unum Life Insurance Company of America. by Attorney Steven D. Davidson on behalf of Defendants Unum Life Insurance Company of America, Unum Group.(Davidson, Steven)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER granting #4 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. Unum Life Insurance Company of America shall file an answer or other responsive pleading by July 2, 2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (JLM)
June 13, 2019 Filing 4 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Steven D. Davidson on behalf of Defendant Unum Life Insurance Company of America.(Davidson, Steven)
June 12, 2019 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Unum Life Insurance Company of America. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(JAB)
June 12, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Senior Judge Laurie Smith Camp and Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (JAB)
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL against Michelle Lyles from District Court of Douglas County, NE, Case number CI 19-387 ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-3957704) with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney Steven D. Davidson on behalf of Unum Life Insurance Company of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Davidson, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lyles v. Unum Life Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unum Life Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Steven D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Lyles
Represented By: Julie D. Tabor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?