Doe v. Frakes et al
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Defendant: State of Nebraska, Crystal Rempel, Sonny Steele, Correct Care Solutions, LLC, Brian Gage, Sarah Glass, Scott Frakes, Diane J. Sabatka-Rine, Jeffrey A. Damme, Randy T. Kohl, Lucas Roede and Christopher Ulrich
Case Number: 8:2019cv00252
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Susan M Bazis
Referring Judge: Robert F Rossiter
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Filing 47 ANSWER to Notice of Removal Complaint regarding: Amended Complaint #31 by Lucas Roede (Gydesen, Phoebe)
August 9, 2019 Filing 46 ANSWER to Notice of Removal Complaint regarding: Amended Complaint #31 by Brian Gage (Gydesen, Phoebe)
August 9, 2019 Filing 45 Summons Issued as to defendant Sonny Steele regarding Amended Complaint #31 . YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LKO)
August 8, 2019 Filing 44 ANSWER to Notice of Removal Complaint regarding: Amended Complaint #31 by Randy T. Kohl (Gydesen, Phoebe)
August 8, 2019 Filing 43 Summons Requested as to Sonny Steele regarding Amended Complaint #31 . (Shiffermiller, Joy)
August 8, 2019 Filing 42 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon by sheriff of Otoe Co. defendant Crystal Rempel. (Shiffermiller, Joy)
August 7, 2019 Filing 41 Summons Returned Unexecuted *unclaimed" as to defendant Sonny Steele. (Shiffermiller, Joy)
August 5, 2019 Filing 40 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon Diane J. Sabatka-Rine defendant Jane Doe. (Shiffermiller, Joy)
August 5, 2019 Filing 39 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon Scott Frakes defendant Jane Doe. (Shiffermiller, Joy)
July 31, 2019 Filing 38 Summons Issued as to defendants Sarah Glass and Crystal Rempel. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (KLF)
July 31, 2019 Filing 37 Summons Requested as to Sarah Glass regarding Amended Complaint #31 . (Shiffermiller, Joy)
July 31, 2019 Filing 36 Summons Requested as to Crystal Rempel regarding Amended Complaint #31 . (Shiffermiller, Joy)
July 30, 2019 Filing 35 ANSWER to Amended Complaint #31 by Correct Care Solutions, LLC, Jeffrey A. Damme (Eveland, Renee)
July 29, 2019 Filing 34 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to defendant Crystal Rempel. (Shiffermiller, Joy)
July 29, 2019 Filing 33 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to defendant Sarah Glass. (Shiffermiller, Joy)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER that the State of Nebraska's Motion to Dismiss (Filing No. #4 ) is denied as moot. Plaintiff Jane Doe is permitted to use a pseudonym at this time. Ordered by Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. (JSF)
July 29, 2019 Filing 31 AMENDED COMPLAINT with with jury demand First Amended Complaint against Defendant All Defendants, by Attorney Joy A. Shiffermiller on behalf of Jane Doe(Shiffermiller, Joy)
July 25, 2019 Filing 30 AMENDED COMPLAINT with jury demand against Defendant Frakes, et al by Attorney Joy A. Shiffermiller on behalf of Jane Doe(Shiffermiller, Joy) Modified on 7/26/2019 to reflect amended complaint is against all defendants (MKR).
July 22, 2019 Filing 29 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon Randy Kohl defendant Jane Doe. (Shiffermiller, Joy)
July 22, 2019 Filing 28 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon Brian Gage defendant Jane Doe. (Shiffermiller, Joy)
July 22, 2019 Filing 27 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon Lucas Roede defendant Jane Doe. (Shiffermiller, Joy)
July 22, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Abby Osborn by Attorney Joy A. Shiffermiller on behalf of Plaintiff Jane Doe (Shiffermiller, Joy)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 TEXT ORDER granting #23 Unopposed Motion to Amend Complaint. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRH)
July 18, 2019 Filing 24 AMENDED COMPLAINT with with jury demand against Defendant All Defendants, by Attorney Joy A. Shiffermiller on behalf of Jane Doe(Shiffermiller, Joy)
July 18, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION to Amend Complaint by Abby Osborn by Attorney Joy A. Shiffermiller on behalf of Plaintiff Jane Doe.(Shiffermiller, Joy)
July 17, 2019 Filing 22 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent Correct Care Solutions Group Holdings, LLC, Corporate Parent CCS-CHC Holdings, LLC for Correct Care Solutions, LLC. by Attorney Renee A. Eveland on behalf of Defendants Correct Care Solutions, LLC, Correct Care Solutions Group Holdings, LLC, CCS-CHC Holdings, LLC.(Eveland, Renee)
July 17, 2019 Filing 21 Summons Issued as to defendant Scott Frakes, Brian Gage, Randy T. Kohl, Lucas Roede, and Diane J. Sabatka-Rine. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LAC)
July 17, 2019 Filing 20 Summons Requested as to Lucas Roede regarding Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint, #1 . (Shiffermiller, Joy)
July 17, 2019 Filing 19 Summons Requested as to Diane J. Sabatka-Rine regarding Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint, #1 . (Shiffermiller, Joy)
July 17, 2019 Filing 18 Summons Requested as to Randy Kohl regarding Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint, #1 . (Shiffermiller, Joy)
July 17, 2019 Filing 17 Summons Requested as to Brian Gage regarding Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint, #1 . (Shiffermiller, Joy)
July 17, 2019 Filing 16 Summons Requested as to Scott Frakes regarding Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint, #1 . (Shiffermiller, Joy)
July 10, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon Sonny Steele c/o NE Atty Gen Off defendant Jane Doe. (Shiffermiller, Joy)
July 10, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon Crystal Rempel c/o NE Atty Gen Off defendant Jane Doe. (Shiffermiller, Joy)
July 10, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon Christopher Ulrich c/o NE Atty Gen Off defendant Jane Doe. (Shiffermiller, Joy)
July 10, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon Sarah Glass c/o NE Atty Gen Off defendant Jane Doe on 7/8/2019. (Shiffermiller, Joy)
July 9, 2019 Filing 11 Summons Returned Unexecuted on Christopher Ulrich-wrong person as to defendant Jane Doe. (Shiffermiller, Joy)
July 3, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to defendant's Sarah Glass, Crystal Rempel, Sonny Steele, and Christopher Ulrich in the care of Nebraska Attorney General's Office. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LKO)
July 3, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to defendants Sarah Glass, Crystal Rempel, Sonny Steele, and Christopher Ulrich. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LKO)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting #6 Unopposed Motion to Extend. Plaintiff shall respond to the Motion to Dismiss #4 by July 18, 2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRH)
July 3, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Requested as to Sonny Steele w/o NE Atty Gen Office regarding Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint, #1 . (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Complaint, #3 Complaint, #4 Complaint, #5 Complaint, #6 Complaint, #7 Complaint)(Shiffermiller, Joy)
July 2, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Extend Brief of Plaintiff MOTION to Dismiss Defendant State of Nebraska #4 by Attorney Joy A. Shiffermiller on behalf of Plaintiff Jane Doe.(Shiffermiller, Joy)
June 20, 2019 Filing 5 BRIEF in support of MOTION to Dismiss Defendant State of Nebraska #4 by Attorney Phoebe L. Gydesen on behalf of Defendant State of Nebraska.(Gydesen, Phoebe)
June 20, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant State of Nebraska by Attorney Phoebe L. Gydesen on behalf of Defendant State of Nebraska.(Gydesen, Phoebe)
June 19, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Notice of Removal Complaint regarding: Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint, #1 by Correct Care Solutions, LLC, Jeffrey A. Damme (Eveland, Renee)
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LKO)
June 13, 2019 FILING FEE PAID on behalf of Defendant State of Nebraska. Receipt number 4007598, in the amount of $400. (LKO)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand against All Plaintiffs from District Court of Douglas County, Case number CI 19-3786 with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney Ryan S. Post on behalf of State of Nebraska (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Post, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. Frakes et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Nebraska
Represented By: Ryan S. Post
Represented By: Phoebe L. Gydesen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crystal Rempel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonny Steele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correct Care Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Renee A. Eveland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Gage
Represented By: Phoebe L. Gydesen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah Glass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Frakes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diane J. Sabatka-Rine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey A. Damme
Represented By: Renee A. Eveland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy T. Kohl
Represented By: Phoebe L. Gydesen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lucas Roede
Represented By: Phoebe L. Gydesen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Ulrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Represented By: Joy A. Shiffermiller
Represented By: Abby K. Osborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?