Jalloh v. Troutman Trucking, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Osman I. Jalloh
Defendant: Paul P Kottenstette, Troutman Trucking, LLC and Paul P. Kottenstette
Case Number: 8:2019cv00263
Filed: June 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Susan M Bazis
Referring Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by August 27, 2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRH)
August 6, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Raymond R. Aranza on behalf of Defendants Paul P. Kottenstette, Troutman Trucking, LLC.(Aranza, Raymond)
August 6, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Raymond R. Aranza on behalf of Defendants Paul P. Kottenstette, Troutman Trucking, LLC (Aranza, Raymond)
July 15, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to defendant Troutman Trucking, LLC. (Welsh, Christopher)
July 15, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to defendant Paul P. Kottenstette. (Welsh, Christopher)
June 20, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to defendants Paul P Kottenstette and Troutman Trucking, LLC. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LKO)
June 20, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Requested as to Paul P. Kottenstette regarding Complaint #1 . (Welsh, Christopher)
June 20, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Requested as to Troutman Trucking, LLC regarding Complaint #1 . (Welsh, Christopher)
June 19, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Senior Judge Laurie Smith Camp and Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LKO)
June 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-3962310), by Attorney Christopher P. Welsh on behalf of Osman I. Jalloh(Welsh, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jalloh v. Troutman Trucking, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul P Kottenstette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Troutman Trucking, LLC
Represented By: Raymond R. Aranza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul P. Kottenstette
Represented By: Raymond R. Aranza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Osman I. Jalloh
Represented By: Christopher P. Welsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?