Miranda et al v. Classic Concepts Construction, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Herminia Miranda and Hugo E Miranda
Defendant: John Benefield, Prairie Engineering, Inc. and Classic Concepts Construction, LLC
Case Number: 8:2019cv00267
Filed: June 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Bataillon
Referring Judge: Cheryl R Zwart
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Filing 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent Premier Tech, Inc. for Prairie Engineering, Inc.. by Attorney Alan T. Fogleman on behalf of Defendants Prairie Engineering, Inc., Premier Tech, Inc..(Fogleman, Alan)
July 31, 2019 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Michael T. Gibbons on behalf of Defendant Classic Concepts Construction, LLC.(Gibbons, Michael)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LKO)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER - Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 8/28/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LKO)
July 26, 2019 Filing 12 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Prairie Engineering, Inc.. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(JAB)
July 26, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint with with jury demand by Prairie Engineering, Inc. (Fogleman, Alan)
July 26, 2019 Filing 10 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Classic Concepts Construction, LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(TCL)
July 25, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant John Benefield on 7/6/2019; Classic Concepts Construction, LLC on 7/6/2019. (Crowl, Richard)
July 25, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with with jury demand by John Benefield, Classic Concepts Construction, LLC (Gibbons, Michael)
June 21, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Prairie Engineering, Inc. on 6/21/2019. (Crowl, Richard)
June 20, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to defendants John Benefield, Classic Concepts Construction, LLC, and Prairie Engineering, Inc. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LKO)
June 20, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Requested as to Prairie Engineering, Inc. regarding Complaint, #1 . (Crowl, Richard)
June 20, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Requested as to Classic Concepts Construction, LLC regarding Complaint, #1 . (Crowl, Richard)
June 20, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Requested as to John Benefield regarding Complaint, #1 . (Crowl, Richard)
June 20, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon and Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LKO)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against John Benefield, Classic Concepts Construction, LLC, Prairie Engineering, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-3963216), by Attorney Richard D. Crowl, Jr. on behalf of Hugo E Miranda, Herminia Miranda(Crowl, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miranda et al v. Classic Concepts Construction, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Benefield
Represented By: Michael T. Gibbons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prairie Engineering, Inc.
Represented By: Alan T. Fogleman
Represented By: Byron A. Bowles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Classic Concepts Construction, LLC
Represented By: Michael T. Gibbons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herminia Miranda
Represented By: Richard D. Crowl, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hugo E Miranda
Represented By: Richard D. Crowl, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?