Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employes Division/IBT v. BNSF Railway, Inc.
Plaintiff: Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employes Division/IBT
Defendant: BNSF Railway, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2019cv00271
Filed: June 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Susan M Bazis
Referring Judge: Robert F Rossiter
Nature of Suit: Labor: Railway Labor Act
Cause of Action: 45:153
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2019 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway Inc., Other Affiliate Burlington Northern Santa Fe, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company, Other Affiliate Burlington Northern Santa Fe, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company, Other Affiliate National Indemnity Company, a Nebraska corporation for BNSF Railway, Inc.. by Attorney Nichole S. Bogen on behalf of Defendants BNSF Railway, Inc., Berkshire Hathaway Inc., National Indemnity Company, a Nebraska corporation, Burlington Northern Santa Fe, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company, Burlington Northern Santa Fe, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company.(Bogen, Nichole)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER granting #7 Joint Motion to Hold Case in Abeyance. This action is stayed pending the National Railroad Adjustment Board's ("NRAB") decision on the petition for interpretation. The parties shall file a joint report every 60 days advising as to the status of the NRAB's proceedings and shall notify the Court within 30 days of issuance of the NRAB's decision. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRH)
July 24, 2019 Filing 9 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney David Pryor has not paid the biennial assessment. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LKO)
July 23, 2019 Filing 8 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant BNSF Railway, Inc. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(CS)
July 23, 2019 Filing 7 JOINT MOTION to Hold Case in Abeyance Pending Arbitration by Attorney Nichole S. Bogen on behalf of Defendant BNSF Railway, Inc..(Bogen, Nichole)
July 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance of Nichole S. Bogen and David M. Pryor by Attorney Nichole S. Bogen on behalf of Defendant BNSF Railway, Inc. (Bogen, Nichole)
July 10, 2019 Filing 5 TEXT ORDER granting Application for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically #4 . Filing fee in the amount of $400.00 is refunded to the payor, Robert E. O'Connor, Jr., receipt number ANEDC-3964963. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (DKM)
June 27, 2019 Filing 4 APPLICATION for Refund of filing fee paid electronically by Attorney Robert E. O'Connor, Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employes Division/IBT.(O'Connor, Robert)
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Richard S. Edelman has not paid the biennial assessment. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LKO)
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LKO)
June 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Enforcement of Arbitration Award against BNSF Railway, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-3964966), by Attorney Robert E. O'Connor, Jr. on behalf of Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employes Division/IBT (O'Connor, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employes Division/IBT v. BNSF Railway, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employes Division/IBT
Represented By: Richard S. Edelman
Represented By: Robert E. O'Connor, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNSF Railway, Inc.
Represented By: David Pryor
Represented By: Nichole S. Bogen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?