Mumin v. Hansen
Petitioner: Dukhan Mumin
Respondent: Brad Hansen
Interested Party: Nebraska Attorney General
Case Number: 8:2019cv00272
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Referring Judge: Richard G Kopf
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Have Habeas Corpus Action Considered Pursuant to 18 U.S.C.A. 2241 on behalf of Petitioner Dukhan Mumin. (KLF)
August 2, 2019 Filing 10 EVIDENCE INDEX on behalf of Petitioner Dukhan Mumin. (KLF)
July 29, 2019 Filing 9 CLARIFICATION OF FACTS AND LAW on behalf of Petitioner Dukhan Mumin. (KLF)
July 25, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by pro se petitioner Dukhan Mumin. (KLF)
July 18, 2019 Filing 7 SUPPLEMENT regarding Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus #1 on behalf of Petitioner Dukhan Mumin. (KLF)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Petitioner's Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (Filing No. #2 ) is granted. The next step in this case is for the court to conduct a preliminary review of the habeas corpus petition in accordance with Rule 4 of the Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases. The court will conduct this review in its normal course of business. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (KLF)
July 10, 2019 Filing 5 PRISONER ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Petitioner Dukhan Mumin. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). (KLF)
June 24, 2019 Filing 4 LETTER by Clerk requesting plaintiff's trust account statement from institution. Letter sent to Bruce Hunzeker, Inmate Accounting, Nebraska Department of Correctional Services, Central Office Accounting, PO Box 94661, Lincoln, NE 68508. (KLF)
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Clerk acknowledging receipt of complaint filed by a pro se party. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (KLF)
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis on behalf of Petitioner Dukhan Mumin. (KLF)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by pro se petitioner Dukhan Mumin. (KLF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mumin v. Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Brad Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Nebraska Attorney General
Represented By: Douglas J. Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Dukhan Mumin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?