Drucklieb v. Ryan
Plaintiff: William P. Drucklieb
Defendant: Cara Ryan
Case Number: 8:2019cv00279
Filed: June 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Referring Judge: Richard G Kopf
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 JUDGMENT - Pursuant to the Memorandum and Order entered this date, this case is dismissed without prejudice for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. (Attachments: #1 Notice - Civil Appeals in Pro Se Cases) Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (KLF)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - This case is dismissed without prejudice for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. Judgment shall be entered by separate document. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (KLF)
August 12, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT with jury demand against Defendant Cara Ryan filed by pro se Plaintiff William P. Drucklieb. (KLF)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - On the court's own motion, Plaintiff will have 30 days from the date of this Memorandum and Order to file an amended complaint that complies with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 8. Failure to do so will result in dismissal of this matter without further notice. The clerk's office is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this matter: August 12, 2019 - deadline for Plaintiff to file amended complaint. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (KLF)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that leave to proceed in forma pauperis is granted, and the Complaint shall be filed without payment of fees. Plaintiff is advised that the next step in his case will be for the court to conduct an initial review of his claims to determine whether summary dismissal is appropriate under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2). The court will conduct this initial review in its normal course of business. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(LAC)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 GENERAL ORDER NO. 2016-02: This general order provides for the management and assignment of cases filed by a plaintiff or petitioner without counsel. This general order also includes the definition of the pro se docket, responsibilities of the pro se law clerks and scheduling and discovery requirements in pro se cases. Ordered by Senior Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (KLF)
June 27, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Clerk acknowledging receipt of complaint filed by a pro se party. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (KLF)
June 26, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis on behalf of Plaintiff William P. Drucklieb. (KLF)
June 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Defendant Cara Ryan filed on behalf of pro se Plaintiff William P. Drucklieb. (KLF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Drucklieb v. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William P. Drucklieb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cara Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?