Ryan v. Drucklieb
Plaintiff: Cara Ryan
Defendant: William Drucklieb
Case Number: 8:2019cv00280
Filed: June 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Referring Judge: Pro Se Docket
2 Judge: Richard G Kopf
3 Judge: Cheryl R Zwart
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2019 Filing 15 SCHEDULING LETTER from USCA - 8th Circuit (19-2761) as to Notice of Appeal to USCA #10 . (LAC)
August 19, 2019 Filing 14 Letter by Clerk USCA-8th Circuit (19-2762) regarding Notice of Appeal to USCA #10 . (Attachments: #1 ProSe NDA) (LAC)
August 16, 2019 Filing 13 NOTIFICATION OF APPEAL AND NOA SUPPLEMENT by Clerk to USCA regarding Notice of Appeal to USCA #10 , Memorandum and Order #5 , Judgment - Pro Se, #6 , Memorandum and Order #9 . Notice of Appeal filed on 08/12/2019 by Defendant William Drucklieb. (LAC)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that Defendant's Motion for Leave to Appeal in Forma Pauperis (filing no. #11 ) is granted. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LAC)
August 12, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis on behalf of Defendant William Drucklieb. (LAC)
August 12, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEAL regarding Memorandum and Order #5 , Judgment - Pro Se, #6 , and Memorandum and Order #9 , on behalf of Defendant William Drucklieb. Copy mailed to defendant at 1201 Fort Crook, Unit J, Bellevue, NE 68005. (LAC)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the Defendant's Objection (Filing No. #7 ) to the Magistrate Judge's Findings and Recommendation (Filing No. #3 ) is denied, and the court's Memorandum and Order and Judgment (Filing Nos. #5 , #6 ) adopting such Recommendation and remanding this matter to the District Court of Sarpy County, Nebraska, remains unchanged. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LAC)
July 11, 2019 Filing 8 BRIEF in support of OBJECTION TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S ORDER regarding Order on Findings and Recommendation #3 on behalf of Defendant William Drucklieb.(LAC)
July 11, 2019 Filing 7 OBJECTION TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S ORDER regarding FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION #3 on behalf of Defendant William Drucklieb. (LAC)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 JUDGMENT - PRO SE - Pursuant to the Memorandum and Order filed this date adopting Magistrate Judge Zwart's Findings and Recommendation, this action is remanded to the District Court of Sarpy County, Nebraska. (Attachments: #1 Notice - Civil Appeals in Pro Se Cases) Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(LAC)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the Magistrate Judge's Findings and Recommendation (Filing No. #3 ) is adopted, and this action is remanded to the District Court of Sarpy County, Nebraska. Judgment shall be entered by separate document. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(LAC)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REASSIGNMENT ORDER that this case is reassigned to Senior District Judge Richard G. Kopf for disposition and is referred to the pro se docket for judicial supervision. Ordered by Chief Judge John M. Gerrard. (LAC)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION - IT THEREFORE HEREBY IS RECOMMENDED to the Honorable Laurie Smith Camp, Senior United States District Judge, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b), that this case be remanded to the District Court of Sarpy County, Nebraska due to the lack of federal subject matter jurisdiction. The defendant is notified that failing to file an objection to this recommendation as provided in the local rules of this court may be held to be a waiver of any right to appeal the court's adoption of the recommendation. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Filing No. #2 ), is denied as moot. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(LAC)
June 27, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis on behalf of Defendant William Drucklieb.(LAC)
June 26, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL against Cara Ryan from District Court of Sarpy County, Nebraska, Case number CI 19-833 with attached state court pleadings filed by William Drucklieb. (LAC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ryan v. Drucklieb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Drucklieb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cara Ryan
Represented By: Thomas M. Houston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?