Robinson v. Eatherton et al
Plaintiff: Kirk D. Robinson
Defendant: Patrick Lee, Mike Meffor, Stephen Potter, Shawn Eatherton, Brandon Brueggemann, Kari Fisk, Niel Miller, Ryan Carson, Nancy S. Freberg, Chad Hunt and Gerald Jorgensen
Case Number: 8:2019cv00283
Filed: June 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Referring Judge: Richard G Kopf
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Filing 29 LETTER on behalf of Plaintiff Kirk D. Robinson. (LKO)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - that Plaintiff's motion to add evidence and incidents (filing no. #27 ) is denied. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO)
August 7, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION to add evidence and incidents on behalf of Plaintiff Kirk D. Robinson. (LKO)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 JUDGMENT - PRO SE - This case is dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiff is hereby notified that the filing of a notice of appeal will make him liable for payment of the full $505.00 appellate filing fee regardless of the outcome of the appeal. This is because the Prison Litigation Reform Act requires an incarcerated civil appellant to pay the full amount of the $505.00 appellate filing fee by making monthly payments to the court, even if he or she is proceeding in forma pauperis. 28 U.S.C. 1915(b). By filing a notice of appeal, Plaintiff will be consenting to the deduction of the $505.00 filing fee from his prison account by prison officials. (Attachments: #1 Notice - Civil Appeals in Pro Se Cases) Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's claims against Defendants Judge Jorgensen, Judge Carson, Shawn Eatherton, Patrick Lee, Kari Fisk, and Mike Mefford are dismissed with prejudice as these Defendants are immune from suit. This action is dismissed without prejudice. The court will enter judgment by a separate document. Plaintiffs pending motions (filing nos. #9 , #10 , #11 , #12 , #13 , #14 , #16 , #17 , #18 , & #23 ) are denied for the reasons stated in this Memorandum and Order. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO)
August 2, 2019 Filing 24 SUPPLEMENT regarding Complaint - Pro Se #1 on behalf of Plaintiff Kirk D. Robinson. (LKO)
August 2, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION to Amend Defendant List on behalf of Plaintiff Kirk D. Robinson. (LKO)
July 31, 2019 Filing 22 LETTER on behalf of Plaintiff Kirk D. Robinson. (LKO)
July 29, 2019 Filing 21 LETTER on behalf of Plaintiff Kirk D. Robinson.(LKO)
July 29, 2019 Filing 20 LETTER on behalf of Plaintiff Kirk D. Robinson. (LKO)
July 26, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Change of Address on behalf of Plaintiff Kirk D. Robinson. (LKO)
July 25, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Amend list of Defendant's; Order to Compel on behalf of Plaintiff Kirk D. Robinson. (LKO)
July 17, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Amend Claim for Damages on behalf of Plaintiff Kirk D. Robinson. (LKO)
July 17, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Amend List of Defendants; Motion to Add to Allegations and Violations on behalf of Plaintiff Kirk D. Robinson. (LKO)
July 15, 2019 Filing 15 LETTER on behalf of Plaintiff Kirk D. Robinson. (LKO)
July 15, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Intervene; Order to Compell; Amend the defendant list on behalf of Plaintiff Kirk D. Robinson. (LKO)
July 15, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Amend Defendant List & Add Civil Rights Violations on behalf of Plaintiff Kirk D. Robinson. (LKO)
July 12, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Release on behalf of Plaintiff Kirk D. Robinson.(MKR)
July 12, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Release on behalf of Plaintiff Kirk D. Robinson.(MKR)
July 12, 2019 TEXT ENTRY THAT INITIAL FILING fee paid on behalf of Kirk Robinson on 7/12/19. Receipt number 8052537, in the amount of $ 9.04. (ADB)
July 11, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Order of Release on behalf of Plaintiff Kirk D. Robinson. (LKO)
July 11, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to change the issuance of a progression order on behalf of Plaintiff Kirk D. Robinson. (LKO)
July 5, 2019 Filing 8 LETTER and Clerk's Response (MKR)
July 5, 2019 Filing 7 SUPPLEMENT regarding Complaint - Pro Se #1 on behalf of Plaintiff Kirk D. Robinson.(MKR)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed IFP (Filing No. #2 ) is granted. Plaintiff must pay an initial partial filing fee of $9.04 within 30 days, unless the court extends the time in which he has to pay in response to a written motion. After payment of the initial partial filing fee, Plaintiff's institution must collect the additional monthly payments in the manner set forth in 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(2), quoted above, and forward those payments to the court. The clerk's office is directed to send a copy of this order to the appropriate official at Plaintiff's institution. The clerk's office is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: July 31, 2019: initial partial filing fee payment due. Plaintiff is advised that, following payment of the initial partial filing fee, the next step in Plaintiff's case will be for the court to conduct an initial review of Plaintiff's claims to determine whether summary dismissal is appropriate under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2). The court will conduct this initial review in its normal course of business. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party & plaintiff's institution)(LKO)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 GENERAL ORDER NO. 2016-02: This general order provides for the management and assignment of cases filed by a plaintiff or petitioner without counsel. This general order also includes the definition of the pro se docket, responsibilities of the pro se law clerks and scheduling and discovery requirements in pro se cases. Ordered by Chief Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO)
June 27, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by Clerk acknowledging receipt of complaint filed by a pro se party. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO)
June 27, 2019 Filing 3 PRISONER ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Plaintiff Kirk D. Robinson. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). (Pages 5-16 only received). (LKO)
June 27, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis on behalf of Plaintiff Kirk D. Robinson. (LKO)
June 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Brandon Brueggemann, Ryan Carson, Shawn Eatherton, Kari Fisk, Nancy S. Freberg, Chad Hunt, Gerald Jorgensen, Patrick Lee, Mike Meffor, Niel Miller, and Stephen Potter filed on behalf of pro se plaintiff Kirk D. Robinson. (LKO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinson v. Eatherton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kirk D. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Meffor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawn Eatherton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Brueggemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kari Fisk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Niel Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Carson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy S. Freberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald Jorgensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?