Mesadieu v. Frakes et al

Petitioner: Michael I. Mesadieli and Michael I. Mesadieu
Respondent: Scott Frakes, Brad Hansen and Nebraska Attorney General
Case Number: 8:2019cv00289
Filed: July 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Referring Judge: Richard G Kopf
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER that Respondents' Motion for Extension of Time (FirstRequest) (filing no. #8 ) is granted. Respondents' Motion for Summary Judgment shallbe filed on or before September 20, 2019. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(LAC)
August 22, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Extend Memorandum and Order,,,, Set/Reset Pro Se Case Management Deadlines,,, #6 , MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Stacy M. Foust on behalf of Respondents Scott Frakes, Brad Hansen.(Foust, Stacy)
July 25, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Stacy M. Foust on behalf of Respondents Scott Frakes, Brad Hansen (Foust, Stacy)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Upon initial review of the habeas corpus petition (Filing No. #1 ), the court preliminarily determines that Petitioner's claims, as they are set forth in this Memorandum and Order, are potentially cognizable in federal court. By August 22, 2019, Respondent must file a motion for summary judgment or state court records in support of an answer. The clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: August 22, 2019: deadline for Respondent to file state court records in support of answer or motion for summary judgment. The clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: September 23, 2019: check for Respondent's answer and separate brief. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (KLF)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that the Petitioner's Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (Filing No. #2 ) is granted. The next step in this case is for the court to conduct a preliminary review of the habeas corpus petition in accordance with Rule 4 of the Rules Governing Section 2254 cases. The court will conduct this review in its normal course of business. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(LAC)
July 1, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by Clerk acknowledging receipt of complaint filed by a pro se party. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LAC)
July 1, 2019 Filing 3 PRISONER ACCOUNT CERTIFICATE by Petitioner Michael I. Mesadieu. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). (LAC) Modified on 7/2/2019 Plaintiff's name modified (LAC).
July 1, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis on behalf of Petitioner Michael I. Mesadieu.(LAC) Modified on 7/2/2019 Plaintiff's name modified (LAC).
July 1, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by pro se petitioner Michael I. Mesadieu. (LAC) Modified on 7/2/2019 Plaintiff's name modified. (LAC).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mesadieu v. Frakes et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Scott Frakes
Represented By: Stacy M. Foust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Brad Hansen
Represented By: Stacy M. Foust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Nebraska Attorney General
Represented By: Douglas J. Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Michael I. Mesadieli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Michael I. Mesadieu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?