K.S. et al v. Douglas County School District #17 et al
Plaintiff: K S, B W, K.S. and B.W.
Defendant: Kip Colony, Millard Public Schools District No. 17, Heidi Weaver, Matthew Fedde, Andrew Pinkall, Michelle Klug, Douglas County School District #17 and Millard Public Schools District
Case Number: 8:2019cv00301
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Susan M Bazis
Referring Judge: Robert F Rossiter
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 FINAL PROGRESSION ORDER - Depositions due 10/16/20. Pretrial Conference set for 1/28/2021 at 10:00 AM Internet/Telephonic Conferencing before Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. Telephone Conference set for 8/14/2020 at 03:00 PM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LKO)
August 30, 2019 Filing 32 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Attorney Karen K. Bailey on behalf of Plaintiff B.W..(Bailey, Karen)
August 7, 2019 Filing 31 ANSWER to Complaint with with jury demand by Matthew Fedde (Lefler, Steven)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(LKO)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 SCHEDULING ORDER - Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 9/6/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO)
August 5, 2019 Filing 28 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Michelle Klug on 7/31/2019. (Bailey, Karen)
August 5, 2019 Filing 27 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Heidi Weaver on 7/31/2019. (Bailey, Karen)
July 30, 2019 Filing 26 ANSWER to Complaint by Kip Colony, Douglas County School District #17, Michelle Klug, Andrew Pinkall, Heidi Weaver (Young, Duncan)
July 26, 2019 Filing 25 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Matthew Fedde on 7/11/2019. (Bailey, Karen)
July 26, 2019 Filing 24 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Douglas County School District #17 on 7/12/2019. (Bailey, Karen)
July 26, 2019 Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Kip Colony on 7/12/2019. (Bailey, Karen)
July 26, 2019 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Andrew Pinkall on 7/22/2019. (Bailey, Karen)
July 19, 2019 Filing 21 Summons Issued as to defendant Michelle Klug. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LKO)
July 19, 2019 Filing 20 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to defendant Michelle Klug. (Bailey, Karen)
July 19, 2019 Filing 19 Summons Issued as to defendant Heidi Weaver. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LKO)
July 19, 2019 Filing 18 Summons Returned Unexecuted from Douglas County Sheriff as to defendant Heidi Weaver. (Bailey, Karen)
July 19, 2019 Filing 17 Summons Requested as to Michelle Klug regarding Complaint, #1 . (Bailey, Karen)
July 19, 2019 Filing 16 Summons Requested as to Heidi Weaver regarding Complaint, #1 . (Bailey, Karen)
July 9, 2019 Filing 15 Summons Issued as to defendants Douglas County School District #17, Heidi Weaver, Matthew Fedde, Kip Colony, Michelle Klug, and Andrew Pinkall. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LKO)
July 9, 2019 Remark - Public: Attorney contacted regarding Summons Requested #4 , Summons Requested #5 , Summons Requested #6 , Summons Requested #7 , and Summons Requested #8 as summons are blank and need to be filled out in order for the Court to issue. (LKO)
July 9, 2019 Filing 14 Summons Requested as to Douglas County School District regarding Complaint, #1 . (Bailey, Karen)
July 9, 2019 Filing 13 Summons Requested as to Michelle Klug regarding Complaint, #1 . (Bailey, Karen)
July 9, 2019 Filing 12 Summons Requested as to Matthew Fedde regarding Complaint, #1 . (Bailey, Karen)
July 9, 2019 Filing 11 Summons Requested as to Kip Colony regarding Complaint, #1 . (Bailey, Karen)
July 9, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Requested as to Heidi Weaver regarding Complaint, #1 . (Bailey, Karen)
July 9, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Requested as to Andrew C. Pinkall regarding Complaint, #1 . (Bailey, Karen)
July 9, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Requested as to Michelle Klug regarding Complaint, #1 . (Bailey, Karen)
July 9, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Requested as to Kip Colony regarding Complaint, #1 . (Bailey, Karen)
July 9, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Requested as to Heidi Weaver regarding Complaint, #1 . (Bailey, Karen)
July 9, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Requested as to Douglas County School District regarding Complaint, #1 . (Bailey, Karen)
July 9, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Requested as to Andrew C. Pinkall regarding Complaint, #1 . (Bailey, Karen)
July 9, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Laurel P. Hall has not paid the biennial assessment. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LKO)
July 9, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LKO)
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Kip Colony, Matthew Fedde, Michelle Klug, Millard Public Schools District No. 17, Andrew Pinkall, Heidi Weaver ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-3973140), by Attorney Karen K. Bailey on behalf of B W, K S(Bailey, Karen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: K.S. et al v. Douglas County School District #17 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K S
Represented By: Karen K. Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B W
Represented By: Karen K. Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K.S.
Represented By: Karen K. Bailey
Represented By: Laurel P. Hall
Represented By: Albert M. Engles
Represented By: Jacob A. Enenbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B.W.
Represented By: Karen K. Bailey
Represented By: Laurel P. Hall
Represented By: Albert M. Engles
Represented By: Jacob A. Enenbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kip Colony
Represented By: Duncan A. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Millard Public Schools District No. 17
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heidi Weaver
Represented By: Duncan A. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Fedde
Represented By: Steven J. Lefler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Pinkall
Represented By: Duncan A. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Klug
Represented By: Duncan A. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas County School District #17
Represented By: Duncan A. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Millard Public Schools District
Represented By: Duncan A. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?