United States of America v. Gilmore
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Jenny Gilmore
Case Number: 8:2019cv00307
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Susan M Bazis
Referring Judge: John M Gerrard
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7402
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting #6 Unopposed Motion to Continue Show Cause Hearing Deadline. The hearing to show cause scheduled for September 9, 2019 is continued to October 9, 2019, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 7, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (MBM)
August 30, 2019 Filing 6 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Continue Show Cause Hearing Deadline by Attorney Jaclyn L. Klintoe on behalf of Defendant Jenny Gilmore.(Klintoe, Jaclyn)
August 20, 2019 Filing 5 Certificate regarding Declaration #4 of Danielle Platt by Attorney Laurie A. Kelly on behalf of Plaintiff United States of America.(Kelly, Laurie)
August 20, 2019 Filing 4 DECLARATION regarding Complaint #1 , Order Setting Hearing or Trial,,,,,,,, #3 Declaration of Danielle Platte Regarding Service by Attorney Laurie A. Kelly on behalf of Plaintiff United States of America.(Kelly, Laurie)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER - Jenny Gilmore shall appear before the District Court of the United States for the District of Nebraska, at 111 S. 18th Plaza, Omaha, Nebraska, at 10:00 a.m. on the 9th day of September, 2019, in Courtroom 7 to show cause why she should not be compelled to comply with the Internal Revenue Service summons served on respondent on February 12, 2019. A copy of this Order, together with the Petition and attachments thereto, shall be served on Respondent by an official of the Internal Revenue Service who is hereby specially appointed for that purpose, and such service shall be made pursuant to Rule 4.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. Within 5 days of service of copies of this Order, the Petition and attachments thereto, Respondent shall file and serve a written response to the Petition. If respondent has any defenses to present or motions to make in opposition to the Petition, such defenses or motions, if any, shall be made in writing and filed with the Court, and copies served on the United States Attorney at least five (5) business days prior to the date of the show cause hearing. Only those issues raised by motion or brought into controversy by the responsive pleading shall be considered by the Court. Any uncontested allegations in the Petition shall be deemed admitted. In the event no written response to the Petition is filed and served in accordance with this Order, or in the event the response filed does not deny or controvert the allegations of the Petition, the allegations in the Petition will be deemed admitted, and an order will be entered compelling Respondent to comply with the Summons. If Respondent has no objection to compliance with the Summons, Respondent may, at least three (3) business days prior to the date of the show cause hearing, notify the clerk of this Court, in writing, with copies to the United States Attorney, of the fact that no response or appearance as ordered herein will be required because Respondent will comply with the Summons. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LKO)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Chief Judge John M. Gerrard and Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (ADB)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jenny Gilmore, by Attorney Laurie A. Kelly on behalf of United States of America (Attachments: #1 Declaration Danielle Platte, #2 IRS Summons)(Kelly, Laurie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Gilmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jenny Gilmore
Represented By: Jaclyn L. Klintoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Laurie A. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?