Keim T.S., Inc. et al v. Best Trucking Business, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Burl Richards and Keim T.S., Inc.
Defendant: Manuel Rubio Lopez and Best Trucking Business, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2019cv00318
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Referring Judge: Michael D Nelson
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2019 Filing 16 TEXT ORDER: The parties voluntarily consent to reassignment to the referral magistrate judge. Pursuant to NEGenR.1.4(a)(3)(C)(i). Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. Judge Brian C. Buescher is no longer assigned to case. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (LKO)
September 16, 2019 Filing 15 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Attorney Michael L. Moran on behalf of Plaintiffs Keim T.S., Inc., Burl Richards.(Moran, Michael)
September 16, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Service of Defendants' Rule 26 Disclosures by Attorney Jerald L. Rauterkus on behalf of Defendants Best Trucking Business, Inc., Manuel Rubio Lopez (Rauterkus, Jerald)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT REASSIGNMENT ORDER - that in the interest of judicial economy, this case is reassigned to Judge Brian C. Buescher for disposition. The magistrate judge remains assigned to the case for judicial supervision and processing of all pretrial matters. Ordered by Chief Judge John M. Gerrard. (DKM)
August 21, 2019 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Jerald L. Rauterkus on behalf of Defendant Best Trucking Business, Inc..(Rauterkus, Jerald)
August 21, 2019 Filing 11 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Best Trucking Business, Inc. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(CS)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (TCL)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER - Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 9/20/2019.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (TCL)
August 20, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Best Trucking Business, Inc., Manuel Rubio Lopez (Rauterkus, Jerald)
August 2, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Michael L. Moran on behalf of Plaintiff Keim T.S., Inc..(Moran, Michael)
August 1, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to defendants Best Trucking Business, Inc. and Manuel Rubio Lopez. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LKO)
August 1, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Requested as to BEST TRUCKING BUSINESS, INC. regarding Complaint #1 . (Moran, Michael)
August 1, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Requested as to MANUEL RUBIO LOPEZ regarding Complaint #1 . (Moran, Michael)
July 19, 2019 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Plaintiff Keim T.S., Inc.. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (LKO)
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Senior Judge Laurie Smith Camp and Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LKO)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-3980759), by Attorney Michael L. Moran on behalf of Keim T.S., Inc., Burl Richards(Moran, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Keim T.S., Inc. et al v. Best Trucking Business, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Burl Richards
Represented By: Michael L. Moran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keim T.S., Inc.
Represented By: Michael L. Moran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manuel Rubio Lopez
Represented By: Jerald L. Rauterkus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Best Trucking Business, Inc.
Represented By: Jerald L. Rauterkus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?