Kinning v. IC System, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: Joseph Kinning
Defendant: Verizon Wireless Services, LLC, Diversified Consultants, Inc. and IC System, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2019cv00325
Filed: July 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: John M Gerrard
Referring Judge: Michael D Nelson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2020 Filing 40 Certificate of Service/Defendant IC System's Initial Disclosures by Attorney Joshua C. Dickinson on behalf of Defendant IC System, Inc..(Dickinson, Joshua)
January 6, 2020 Filing 39 NOTICE of Serving Plaintiff's Rule 26 Disclosures on IC System, Inc. by Attorney William L. Reinbrecht on behalf of Plaintiff Joseph Kinning (Reinbrecht, William)
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 TEXT ORDER granting #37 Stipulation for Dismissal. The plaintiff's claims against Verizon Wireless Services, LLC are dismissed with prejudice. Verizon Wireless Services, LLC is terminated as a party. Ordered by Chief Judge John M. Gerrard. (DCD)
December 27, 2019 Filing 37 STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL of Defendant Verizon Wireless Services, LLC only by Attorney William L. Reinbrecht on behalf of Plaintiff Joseph Kinning.(Reinbrecht, William)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 PROTECTIVE ORDER - Upon consideration of the parties' joint request for entry of a Protective Order in the Rule 26(f) Meeting Report, (Filing No. #33 ), the Court enters the following Protective Order governing the disclosure of confidential Discovery Material by a Producing Party to a Receiving Party in this Action. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (LKO)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 CASE PROGRESSION ORDER - Depositions due 10/30/20. A status conference to discuss case progression and the parties' interest in settlement will be held with the undersigned magistrate judge on August 10, 2020, at 10:00 a.m. by telephone. Counsel shall use the conferencing instructions assigned to this case to participate in the conference. A status conference to discuss dispositive motions, the pretrial conference and trial dates, and settlement status will be held with the undersigned magistrate judge on September 14, 2020, at 11:00 a.m. by telephone. Counsel shall use the conferencing instructions assigned to this case to participate in the conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (LKO)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER - On or before December 27, 2019, the plaintiff and defendant Verizon Wireless Services, LLC shall electronically file a joint stipulation for dismissal (or other dispositive stipulation) and shall submit to the trial judge a draft order which will fully dispose of the plaintiffs' claims against Verizon Wireless Services, LLC. Absent compliance with this order, the plaintiff's claims against Verizon Wireless Services, LLC may be dismissed without further notice. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (LKO)
November 25, 2019 Filing 33 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Attorney William L. Reinbrecht on behalf of Plaintiff Joseph Kinning.(Reinbrecht, William)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (LKO)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 SCHEDULING ORDER - Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 11/25/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (LKO)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 TEXT ORDER approving #29 Stipulation for Dismissal. The plaintiff's claims against Diversified Consultants, Inc. are dismissed with prejudice. Diversified Consultants, Inc. is terminated as a party. Ordered by Chief Judge John M. Gerrard. (DCD)
October 23, 2019 Filing 29 STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL by Attorney Robert W. Shively, Jr. on behalf of Defendant Diversified Consultants, Inc..(Shively, Robert)
October 7, 2019 Filing 28 ANSWER to Complaint with with jury demand by Verizon Wireless Services, LLC (Shannon, Liliana)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 TEXT ORDER granting 26 Unopposed Email Motion. Defendant Diversified Consultants Inc. shall have an extension of time to October 23, 2019, to file an answer or other responsive pleading to the Complaint. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (SMN)
September 23, 2019 Filing 26 UNOPPOSED TEXT EMAIL MOTION by counsel for Defendant Diversified Consultants, Inc. requesting an extension of time to file a responsive pleading. (SMN)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 TEXT ORDER granting #24 Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. Defendant Verizon Wireless Services, LLC shall have an extension of time to October 7, 2019, to file an answer or other responsive pleading to the Complaint. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (SMN)
September 23, 2019 Filing 24 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Liliana E. Shannon on behalf of Defendant Verizon Wireless Services, LLC.(Shannon, Liliana)
September 3, 2019 Filing 23 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Joshua C. Dickinson on behalf of Defendant IC System, Inc..(Dickinson, Joshua)
September 3, 2019 Filing 22 ANSWER to Complaint by IC System, Inc. (Dickinson, Joshua)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 TEXT ORDER granting #20 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. Defendant IC System, Inc. shall file an answer or other responsive pleading to the Complaint on or before September 3, 2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (SMN)
August 28, 2019 Filing 20 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Joshua C. Dickinson on behalf of Defendant IC System, Inc..(Dickinson, Joshua)
August 15, 2019 Filing 19 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent Verizon Communications Inc., Corporate Parent Verizon Communications Inc. for Verizon Wireless Services, LLC. by Attorney Liliana E. Shannon on behalf of Defendants Verizon Wireless Services, LLC, Verizon Communications Inc., Verizon Communications Inc..(Shannon, Liliana)
August 15, 2019 Filing 18 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Verizon Wireless Services, LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (KMM)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT ORDER granting #16 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. Defendant Verizon Wireless Services, LLC shall have an extension of time to September 23, 2019, to file an answer or other responsive pleading to the Complaint. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (SMN)
August 15, 2019 Filing 16 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Liliana E. Shannon on behalf of Defendant Verizon Wireless Services, LLC.(Shannon, Liliana)
August 15, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Liliana E. Shannon on behalf of Defendant Verizon Wireless Services, LLC (Shannon, Liliana)
August 11, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant IC System, Inc. on 8/5/2019. (Reinbrecht, William)
August 7, 2019 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Robert W. Shively, Jr. on behalf of Defendant Diversified Consultants, Inc..(Shively, Robert)
August 6, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Diversified Consultants, Inc. on 8/1/2019. (Reinbrecht, William)
August 6, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Verizon Wireless Services, LLC on 8/1/2019. (Reinbrecht, William)
August 5, 2019 Filing 10 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Diversified Consultants, Inc. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (KMM)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER granting 8 Email Motion. Defendant Diversified Consultants Inc. shall file an answer or other responsive pleading on or before September 23, 2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (SMN)
August 2, 2019 Filing 8 UNOPPOSED TEXT EMAIL MOTION - by counsel for Diversified Consultants, Inc. requesting an extension of time to file a responsive pleading. (SMN)
August 2, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Robert W. Shively, Jr. on behalf of Defendant Diversified Consultants, Inc. (Shively, Robert)
July 25, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to defendants Diversified Consultants, Inc., IC System, Inc., and Verizon Wireless Services, LLC. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LKO)
July 25, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Requested as to Verizon Wireless Services, LLC regarding Complaint #1 . (Reinbrecht, William)
July 25, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Requested as to IC System, Inc. regarding Complaint #1 . (Reinbrecht, William)
July 25, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Requested as to Diversified Consultants, Inc. regarding Complaint #1 . (Reinbrecht, William)
July 25, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Chief Judge John M. Gerrard and Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LKO)
July 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-3984818), by Attorney Pamela A. Car on behalf of Joseph Kinning (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A Letter)(Car, Pamela)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kinning v. IC System, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Kinning
Represented By: William L. Reinbrecht
Represented By: Pamela A. Car
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verizon Wireless Services, LLC
Represented By: Liliana E. Shannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diversified Consultants, Inc.
Represented By: Robert W. Shively, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IC System, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua C. Dickinson
Represented By: Shilee T. Mullin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?