Water Engineering, Inc. v. Big Ox Energy, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Water Engineering, Inc., a Foreign Corporation and Water Engineering, Inc.
Defendant: Big Ox Energy-Siouxland, LLC and Big Ox Energy, LLC
Case Number: 8:2019cv00327
Filed: July 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Susan M Bazis
Referring Judge: Brian C Buescher
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2019 Filing 17 BRIEF in support of MOTION for Default Judgment against Big Ox Energy-Siouxland, LLC & Big Ox Energy, LLC #16 by Attorney David L. Welch on behalf of Plaintiff Water Engineering, Inc..(Welch, David)
September 11, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Default Judgment against Big Ox Energy-Siouxland, LLC & Big Ox Energy, LLC by Attorney David L. Welch on behalf of Plaintiff Water Engineering, Inc..(Welch, David)
September 10, 2019 Filing 15 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Defendants Big Ox Energy-Siouxland, LLC and Big Ox Energy, LLC. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (Copies mailed to defendants) (LKO)
September 10, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default against Big Ox Energy, LLC & Big Ox Siouxland by Attorney David L. Welch on behalf of Plaintiff Water Engineering, Inc..(Welch, David)
September 10, 2019 Filing 13 TEXT NOTICE OF INCORRECT EVENT used when filing the Motion for Clerk's Entry of Default #11 by Attorney David L. Welch. In the future, use the event Motions > Clerk's Entry of Default.(LKO)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT REASSIGNMENT ORDER - that in the interest of judicial economy, this case is reassigned to Judge Brian C. Buescher for disposition. The magistrate judge remains assigned to the case for judicial supervision and processing of all pretrial matters. Ordered by Chief Judge John M. Gerrard. (DKM)
September 3, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default against Big Ox Energy-Siouxland, LLC and Big Ox Energy, LLC by Attorney David L. Welch on behalf of Plaintiff Water Engineering, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Welch, David) Modified on 9/10/2019 to reflect correct event type (LKO).
August 1, 2019 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney David L. Welch on behalf of Plaintiff Water Engineering, Inc..(Welch, David)
August 1, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Big Ox Energy, LLC on 7/30/2019. (Welch, David)
August 1, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Big Ox Energy-Siouxland, LLC on 7/30/2019. (Welch, David)
July 29, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to defendants Big Ox Energy, LLC and Big Ox Energy-Siouxland, LLC. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LKO)
July 29, 2019 Filing 6 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Plaintiff Water Engineering, Inc. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (LKO)
July 29, 2019 Filing 5 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Senior Judge Laurie Smith Camp and Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LKO)
July 26, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Requested as to regarding Complaint #1 . (Welch, David)
July 26, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Requested as to Big Ox Energy, LLC regarding Complaint #1 . (Welch, David)
July 26, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of regarding Complaint #1 Civil Cover Sheet by Attorney David L. Welch on behalf of Plaintiff Water Engineering, Inc., a Foreign Corporation (Welch, David)
July 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Big Ox Energy, LLC, Big Ox Energy-Siouxland, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-3986167), by Attorney David L. Welch on behalf of Water Engineering, Inc., a Foreign Corporation(Welch, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Water Engineering, Inc. v. Big Ox Energy, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Water Engineering, Inc., a Foreign Corporation
Represented By: David L. Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Water Engineering, Inc.
Represented By: David L. Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Big Ox Energy-Siouxland, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Big Ox Energy, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?