Cocke et al v. Whisler Aviation Inc. et al
Plaintiff: William Marston Becker, Virginia Francis Cocke and John Hartwell Cocke
Defendant: Whisler Aviation, Inc. and Central Cylinder Service, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2019cv00335
Filed: July 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Brian C Buescher
Referring Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
2 Judge: Michael D Nelson
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney John C. Nettels, Jr. on behalf of Defendant Whisler Aviation, Inc. (Nettels, John)
September 19, 2019 Filing 26 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #22 for attorney John C. Nettels, Jr. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS)
September 19, 2019 Filing 25 REPLY BRIEF in support of MOTION to Dismiss #10 by Attorney Robert E. O'Connor, Jr. on behalf of Defendant Central Cylinder Service, Inc..(O'Connor, Robert)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 TEXT ORDER granting #23 Unopposed Motion to Extend. Plaintiffs shall have an extension of time to October 4, 2019, to file their opposition to Defendant Whistler Aviation's Motion to Dismiss #17 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (SMN)
September 18, 2019 Filing 23 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Extend Deadline to Respond Brief #18 , MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM #17 , Brief #19 , Index #20 by Attorney Daniel D. Barks on behalf of Plaintiffs William Marston Becker, John Hartwell Cocke, John Hartwell Cocke, Virginia Francis Cocke.(Barks, Daniel)
September 18, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4020557 by Attorney John C. Nettels, Jr. on behalf of Defendant Whisler Aviation, Inc..(Nettels, John)
September 13, 2019 Filing 21 RESPONSE regarding MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM #17 by Attorney Daniel D. Barks on behalf of Plaintiffs William Marston Becker, John Hartwell Cocke, John Hartwell Cocke, Virginia Francis Cocke. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Barks, Daniel)
September 6, 2019 Filing 20 INDEX in support of MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM #17 by Attorney Andrea M. Chase on behalf of Defendant Whisler Aviation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Chase, Andrea)
September 6, 2019 Filing 19 BRIEF in support of MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM #17 (Replace Document No. 18) by Attorney Andrea M. Chase on behalf of Defendant Whisler Aviation, Inc..(Chase, Andrea)
September 6, 2019 Filing 18 BRIEF in support of MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM #17 by Attorney Andrea M. Chase on behalf of Defendant Whisler Aviation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Chase, Andrea)
September 6, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Attorney Andrea M. Chase on behalf of Defendant Whisler Aviation, Inc..(Chase, Andrea)
September 6, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Andrea M. Chase on behalf of Defendant Whisler Aviation, Inc. (Chase, Andrea)
September 6, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Joshua C. Dickinson on behalf of Defendant Whisler Aviation, Inc. (Dickinson, Joshua)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT REASSIGNMENT ORDER - that in the interest of judicial economy, this case is reassigned to Judge Brian C. Buescher for disposition. The magistrate judge remains assigned to the case for judicial supervision and processing of all pretrial matters. Ordered by Chief Judge John M. Gerrard. (DKM))
August 29, 2019 Filing 13 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #12 for attorney Daniel Barks. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS)
August 29, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4007914 by Attorney Daniel D. Barks on behalf of Plaintiffs William Marston Becker, John Hartwell Cocke, John Hartwell Cocke, Virginia Francis Cocke.(Barks, Daniel)
August 26, 2019 Filing 11 BRIEF in support of MOTION to Dismiss #10 by Attorney Robert E. O'Connor, Jr. on behalf of Defendant Central Cylinder Service, Inc..(O'Connor, Robert)
August 26, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss by Attorney Robert E. O'Connor, Jr. on behalf of Defendant Central Cylinder Service, Inc..(O'Connor, Robert)
August 26, 2019 Filing 9 BRIEF in support of MOTION to Dismiss by Attorney Robert E. O'Connor, Jr. on behalf of Defendant Central Cylinder Service, Inc.(O'Connor, Robert) Modified on 8/27/2019 to correct docket text to reflect that this filing is a brief(TCL).
August 22, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Whisler Aviation, Inc. on 8/16/2019. (Rowen, Thomas)
August 15, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Central Cylinder Service, Inc. on 8/6/2019. (Rowen, Thomas)
July 31, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to defendant Central Cylinder Service, Inc., Whisler Aviation, Inc. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (TCL)
July 31, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Daniel D. Barks has not registered for admittance to practice nor registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (TCL)
July 31, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Senior Judge Laurie Smith Camp and Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (TCL)
July 31, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Requested as to Whisler Aviation, Inc. regarding Complaint #1 . (Rowen, Thomas)
July 31, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Requested as to Central Cylinder Service, Inc. regarding Complaint #1 . (Rowen, Thomas)
July 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Central Cylinder Service, Inc., Whisler Aviation, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-3988991), by Attorney Thomas M. Rowen on behalf of John Hartwell Cocke(Rowen, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cocke et al v. Whisler Aviation Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whisler Aviation, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua C. Dickinson
Represented By: Andrea M. Chase
Represented By: John C. Nettels, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Cylinder Service, Inc.
Represented By: Robert E. O'Connor, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Marston Becker
Represented By: Thomas M. Rowen
Represented By: Daniel D. Barks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virginia Francis Cocke
Represented By: Thomas M. Rowen
Represented By: Daniel D. Barks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Hartwell Cocke
Represented By: Thomas M. Rowen
Represented By: Daniel D. Barks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?