Metropolitan Omaha Property Owners Association, Inc. et al v. The City of Omaha et al
Plaintiff: Metropolitan Omaha Property Owners Association, Inc. and Roosevelt Lee
Defendant: Jay Davis, Jane Does, John Does, The City of Omaha Nebraska, Jean Stothert, Paul Kratz and The City of Omaha
Case Number: 8:2019cv00341
Filed: August 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Susan M Bazis
Referring Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2019 Filing 15 BRIEF in support of MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM #14 by Attorney Jennifer N. Taylor on behalf of Defendant The City of Omaha.(Taylor, Jennifer)
September 27, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Attorney Jennifer N. Taylor on behalf of Defendant The City of Omaha.(Taylor, Jennifer)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by September 28, 2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRH)
August 21, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Jennifer N. Taylor on behalf of Defendant The City of Omaha.(Taylor, Jennifer)
August 13, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Jean Stothert on 8/8/2019. (Bruno, Jason)
August 13, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant The City of Omaha on 8/8/2019. (Bruno, Jason)
August 13, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Paul Kratz on 8/8/2019. (Bruno, Jason)
August 13, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Jay Davis on 8/9/2019. (Bruno, Jason)
August 6, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to defendants Jay Davis, Paul Kratz, Jean Stothert, and The City of Omaha. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LKO)
August 6, 2019 Filing 6 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Senior Judge Laurie Smith Camp and Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LKO)
August 6, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Requested as to The City of Omaha regarding Complaint, #1 . (Bruno, Jason)
August 6, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Requested as to Jean Stothert regarding Complaint, #1 . (Bruno, Jason)
August 6, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Requested as to Jay Davis regarding Complaint, #1 . (Bruno, Jason)
August 6, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Requested as to Paul Kratz regarding Complaint, #1 . (Bruno, Jason)
August 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Jay Davis, Jane Does, John Does, Paul Kratz, Jean Stothert, The City of Omaha Nebraska ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-3992362), by Attorney Jason M. Bruno on behalf of Metropolitan Omaha Property Owners Association, Inc., Roosevelt Lee(Bruno, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Metropolitan Omaha Property Owners Association, Inc. et al v. The City of Omaha et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Davis
Represented By: Jennifer N. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of Omaha Nebraska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jean Stothert
Represented By: Jennifer N. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Kratz
Represented By: Jennifer N. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of Omaha
Represented By: Jennifer N. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Metropolitan Omaha Property Owners Association, Inc.
Represented By: Jason M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert S. Sherrets
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roosevelt Lee
Represented By: Jason M. Bruno
Represented By: Robert S. Sherrets
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?