Blackbourn v. CHI Nebraska
Plaintiff: April Blackbourn
Defendant: CHI Nebraska d/b/a CHI Health and CHI Nebraska
Case Number: 8:2019cv00352
Filed: August 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Michael D Nelson
Referring Judge: Robert F Rossiter
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:0251
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2019 Filing 14 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #12 for attorney Mark Olthoff. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS)
September 28, 2019 Filing 13 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #11 for attorney Britteny Pfleger. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS)
September 27, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4027417 by Attorney Mark A. Olthoff on behalf of Defendant CHI Nebraska.(Olthoff, Mark)
September 27, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4027411 by Attorney Britteny D. Pfleger on behalf of Defendant CHI Nebraska.(Pfleger, Britteny)
September 17, 2019 Filing 10 E-mail Returned as Undeliverable addressed to ddrake@littler.com regarding Text Order 9 . E-mail resent to ddrake@polsinelli.com. (KLF)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER granting #8 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. Defendant shall have an extension of time to October 17, 2019, to file an answer or other responsive pleading to the Complaint. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (SMN)
September 17, 2019 Filing 8 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Denise K. Drake on behalf of Defendant CHI Nebraska.(Drake, Denise)
September 9, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant CHI Nebraska on 8/26/2019. (Javitch, Mark)
August 19, 2019 Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #2 for attorney Mark Javitch. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS)
August 19, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to defendant CHI Nebraska. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LKO)
August 19, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LKO)
August 17, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Requested as to CHI Nebraska regarding Complaint #1 . (Javitch, Mark)
August 17, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-3998882 by Attorney Mark L. Javitch on behalf of Plaintiff April Blackbourn.(Javitch, Mark)
August 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-3998880), by Attorney Mark L. Javitch on behalf of April Blackbourn (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Javitch, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blackbourn v. CHI Nebraska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: April Blackbourn
Represented By: Mark L. Javitch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHI Nebraska d/b/a CHI Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHI Nebraska
Represented By: Denise K. Drake
Represented By: Mark A. Olthoff
Represented By: Britteny D. Pfleger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?