Youtube, LLC v. Brady Featured Case
Plaintiff: Youtube, LLC
Defendant: Christopher L Brady
Case Number: 8:2019cv00353
Filed: August 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Bataillon
Referring Judge: Susan M Bazis
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:512
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 REASSIGNMENT ORDER - that this case is reassigned to Senior District Judge Joseph F. Bataillon for disposition and remains assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis for judicial supervision. Ordered by Chief Judge John M. Gerrard. (LKO)
October 15, 2019 Filing 18 JOINT STIPULATION for Entry of Judgment and Permanent Injunction by Attorney James P. King on behalf of Plaintiff Youtube, LLC.(King, James)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by October 9, 2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRH)
September 25, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading Stipulated by Attorney Daniel E. Klaus on behalf of Defendant Christopher L Brady.(Klaus, Daniel)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LKO)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by October 2, 2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRH)
September 6, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Sheila A. Bentzen on behalf of Defendant Christopher L Brady.(Bentzen, Sheila)
September 6, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Sheila A. Bentzen on behalf of Defendant Christopher L Brady (Bentzen, Sheila)
September 6, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Daniel E. Klaus on behalf of Defendant Christopher L Brady (Klaus, Daniel)
August 23, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Christopher L Brady on 8/21/2019. (King, James)
August 19, 2019 Filing 9 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #7 for attorney David Kramer. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS)
August 19, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to defendant Christopher L Brady. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LKO)
August 19, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-3999498 by Attorney David H. Kramer on behalf of Plaintiff Youtube, LLC.(Kramer, David)
August 19, 2019 Filing 6 REPORT on the filing of an action filed on 8/19/19 regarding Copyright Infringement (original form mailed to the Office of Register of Copyrights with a copy of complaint #1 .) (LKO)
August 19, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney David H. Kramer has not registered for admittance to practice or registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LKO)
August 19, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNED: Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LKO)
August 19, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent Google LLC, Other Affiliate XXVI Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Alphabet, Inc. for Youtube, LLC. by Attorney James P. King on behalf of Plaintiffs Youtube, LLC, Google LLC, XXVI Holdings, Inc., Alphabet, Inc..(King, James)
August 19, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Requested as to Christopher L. Brady regarding Complaint #1 . (King, James)
August 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Christopher L Brady ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-3998980), by Attorney James P. King on behalf of Youtube, LLC(King, James)
August 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Christopher L Brady ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-3998980), by Attorney James P. King on behalf of Youtube, LLC(King, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Youtube, LLC v. Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Youtube, LLC
Represented By: David H. Kramer
Represented By: Erin R. Robak
Represented By: James P. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher L Brady
Represented By: Daniel E. Klaus
Represented By: Sheila A. Bentzen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?