Clark v. Cada, Cada, Hoffman & Jewson et al
Plaintiff: Lindsey Clark
Defendant: Merchants Credit Adjusters, Inc. and Cada, Cada, Hoffman & Jewson
Case Number: 8:2019cv00354
Filed: August 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: John M Gerrard
Referring Judge: Cheryl R Zwart
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 JUDGMENT - On the parties' joint Stipulation for Dismissal (filing #9 ), this case is dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A) (ii), all parties to pay their own costs. Ordered by Chief Judge John M. Gerrard. (TCL)
October 15, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL by Attorney Ronald F. Krause on behalf of Defendant Cada, Cada, Hoffman & Jewson.(Krause, Ronald)
September 23, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with with jury demand by Cada, Cada, Hoffman & Jewson (Krause, Ronald)
September 1, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Cada, Cada, Hoffman & Jewson on 8/27/2019. (Reinbrecht, William)
August 30, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Merchants Credit Adjusters, Inc. on 8/27/2019. (Reinbrecht, William)
August 21, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to defendant Cada, Cada, Hoffman & Jewson and Merchants Credit Adjusters, Inc. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LKO)
August 21, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Requested as to Merchants Credit Adjusters, Inc. regarding Complaint, #1 . (Reinbrecht, William)
August 21, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Requested as to Cada, Cada, Hoffman & Jewson regarding Complaint, #1 . (Reinbrecht, William)
August 19, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Chief Judge John M. Gerrard and Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LKO)
August 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-3999247), by Attorney William L. Reinbrecht on behalf of Lindsey Clark (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A & B - Letter & Complaint)(Reinbrecht, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clark v. Cada, Cada, Hoffman & Jewson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lindsey Clark
Represented By: William L. Reinbrecht
Represented By: Pamela A. Car
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merchants Credit Adjusters, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cada, Cada, Hoffman & Jewson
Represented By: Ronald F. Krause
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?