Elliott v. Nelnet Servicing, LLC
Plaintiff: Andrew Elliott
Defendant: Nelnet Servicing, LLC
Case Number: 8:2019cv00365
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Michael D Nelson
Referring Judge: Robert F Rossiter
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney James J. Parr on behalf of Plaintiff Andrew Elliott (Parr, James)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 RESTRICTED CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (KLF)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER - Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 11/12/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (KLF)
October 8, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Nelnet Servicing, LLC (Kaplan, Charles)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER granting #8 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. Defendant Nelnet Servicing, LLC shall have an extension of time to October 8, 2019, to file an answer or other responsive pleading to the Complaint. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (SMN)
September 17, 2019 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent Nelnet Diversified Solutions, LLC, Other Affiliate Nelnet, Inc. for Nelnet Servicing, LLC. by Attorney Charles F. Kaplan on behalf of Defendants Nelnet Servicing, LLC, Nelnet Diversified Solutions, LLC, Nelnet, Inc..(Kaplan, Charles)
September 17, 2019 Filing 8 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Charles F. Kaplan on behalf of Defendant Nelnet Servicing, LLC.(Kaplan, Charles)
September 5, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Nelnet Servicing, LLC on 9/3/2019. (Agruss, Michael)
August 27, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to defendant Nelnet Servicing, LLC. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LKO)
August 27, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Place of Trial by Attorney Michael S. Agruss on behalf of Plaintiff Andrew Elliott (Agruss, Michael)
August 27, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Requested as to Nelnet Servicing, LLC regarding Complaint #1 . (Agruss, Michael)
August 26, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Michael S. Agruss has not paid the biennial assessment. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LKO)
August 26, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LKO)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nelnet Servicing, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-4003968), by Attorney Michael S. Agruss on behalf of Andrew Elliott (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Agruss, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Elliott v. Nelnet Servicing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nelnet Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Charles F. Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Elliott
Represented By: Michael S. Agruss
Represented By: James J. Parr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?