Franklin v. Heartland Family Services
Plaintiff: Travis B Franklin
Defendant: Heartland Family Services
Case Number: 8:2019cv00369
Filed: August 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Susan M Bazis
Referring Judge: Robert F Rossiter
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER granting in part and denying in part #8 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave. This action is stayed until November 22, 2019 to allow Plaintiff time to obtain counsel. The Motion to Dismiss #5 will be held in abeyance during this time. Plaintiff's request to file an amended complaint is denied without prejudice to reassertion. Plaintiff shall file a report with the Court no later than November 22, 2019 advising as to whether counsel will be entering an appearance on his behalf. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRH)
October 16, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to File an Amended Complaint on behalf of Plaintiff Travis B. Franklin.(KLF)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - The Court orders Franklin to show cause on or by October 17, 2019, why this case should not be dismissed. Failure to respond may result in the dismissal of this case without further notice. Ordered by Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (JSF)
September 4, 2019 Filing 6 BRIEF in support of MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM #5 by Attorney Leigh C. Joyce on behalf of Defendant Heartland Family Services.(Joyce, Leigh)
September 4, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Attorney Leigh C. Joyce on behalf of Defendant Heartland Family Services.(Joyce, Leigh)
August 29, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Leigh C. Joyce on behalf of Defendant Heartland Family Services.(Joyce, Leigh)
August 29, 2019 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Heartland Family Services. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(CS)
August 26, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (ADB)
August 26, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL against Travis B Franklin from District Court of Douglas County, Nebraska, Case number CI 19-6051 ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-4004827) with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney Leigh C. Joyce on behalf of Heartland Family Services (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Copy of the State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B-Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(Joyce, Leigh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Franklin v. Heartland Family Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travis B Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heartland Family Services
Represented By: Leigh C. Joyce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?