Martin's Bulk Milk Services, Inc. et al v. TransAm Trucking, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Martin's Bulk Milk Services, Inc. and Hartford Fire Insurance Company
Defendant: TransAm Trucking, Inc. and Kevin Rucker
Case Number: 8:2019cv00376
Filed: August 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Referring Judge: Cheryl R Zwart
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2019 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Kevin Rucker on 10/12/2019. (Mullin, David)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER that the parties' joint stipulation, (Filing No. #15 ), is approved. The TransAm Trucking, Inc., shall be identified hereafter as a Missouri corporation. The Clerk of the Court shall correct the docket to identify defendant TransAm Trucking, Inc., as a Missouri corporation. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LAC)
September 23, 2019 Filing 16 Plaintiff Martin's Bulk Milk Service, Inc.'s REPLY to Counterclaim and Demand for Jury Trial by Martin's Bulk Milk Services, Inc. (Mullin, David)
September 23, 2019 Filing 15 STIPULATION and Joint Motion to Correct Docket by Attorney Cathy S. Trent-Vilim on behalf of Defendant TransAm Trucking, Inc..(Trent-Vilim, Cathy)
September 19, 2019 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc., Corporate Parent Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. for Hartford Fire Insurance Company. /s/ John M. Graham, Jr. by Attorney John M. Graham, Jr. on behalf of Plaintiffs Hartford Fire Insurance Company, Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc., Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc..(Graham, John)
September 13, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney John M. Graham, Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Hartford Fire Insurance Company (Graham, John)
September 13, 2019 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to defendant Kevin Rucker. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LAC)
September 13, 2019 Filing 11 Summons Requested as to Kevin Rucker regarding Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint, #1 . (Mullin, David)
September 12, 2019 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Katherine M. Matejka on behalf of Plaintiff Martin's Bulk Milk Services, Inc., Counter Defendant Martin's Bulk Milk Services, Inc..(Matejka, Katherine)
September 3, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Notice of Removal Complaint regarding: Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint, #1 , COUNTERCLAIM against Martin's Bulk Milk Services, Inc. regarding Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint, #1 filed by TransAm Trucking, Inc. by TransAm Trucking, Inc. (Trent-Vilim, Cathy)
August 28, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent Jacobson Holdings, Inc. for TransAm Trucking, Inc.. by Attorney Cathy S. Trent-Vilim on behalf of Defendants TransAm Trucking, Inc., Jacobson Holdings, Inc..(Trent-Vilim, Cathy)
August 28, 2019 Filing 7 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Plaintiff Hartford Fire Insurance Company. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (LKO)
August 28, 2019 Filing 6 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant TransAm Trucking, Inc.. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (LKO)
August 28, 2019 Filing 5 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Plaintiff Martin's Bulk Milk Services, Inc.. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (LKO)
August 28, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney John M. Graham has not registered for admittance to practice or registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LKO)
August 28, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Katherine M. Matejka has not registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LKO)
August 28, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Senior Judge Laurie Smith Camp and Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LKO)
August 27, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL against Hartford Fire Insurance Company, Martin's Bulk Milk Services, Inc. from Douglas County District Court, Case number CI19-5860 ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-4006491) with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney Cathy S. Trent-Vilim on behalf of TransAm Trucking, Inc.(Trent-Vilim, Cathy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martin's Bulk Milk Services, Inc. et al v. TransAm Trucking, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin's Bulk Milk Services, Inc.
Represented By: David C. Mullin
Represented By: Katherine M. Matejka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hartford Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: John M. Graham, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TransAm Trucking, Inc.
Represented By: Cathy S. Trent-Vilim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Rucker
Represented By: Cathy S. Trent-Vilim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?