Medefis, Inc. v. Atlas Medstaff LLC et al
Plaintiff: MEDEFIS, Inc.
Defendant: HMF Capital Group, Inc., Complete Business Solutionsgroup, Inc, Silver Cup Funding LLC, Atlas Medstaff LLC and P2BInvestor, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2019cv00377
Filed: August 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Referring Judge: Michael D Nelson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1335
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 TEXT ORDER granting #29 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. Medefis, Inc. shall file a responsive pleading to P2BInvestor, Inc.'s Counterclaim #25 on or before November 4, 2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (SMN)
October 21, 2019 Filing 29 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Michael T. Hilgers on behalf of Plaintiff Medefis, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hilgers, Michael)
October 10, 2019 Filing 28 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 10/10/2019 by Attorney Glenn H. Stevens on behalf of Defendant P2BInvestor, Inc..(Stevens, Glenn)
October 3, 2019 Filing 27 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Michael J. Whaley on behalf of Defendant Atlas Medstaff LLC.(Whaley, Michael)
October 1, 2019 Filing 26 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant P2BInvestor, Inc. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(CS)
September 30, 2019 Filing 25 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs regarding Complaint #1 filed by Medefis, Inc. by P2BInvestor, Inc. (Stevens, Glenn)
September 25, 2019 Filing 24 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Atlas Medstaff LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(CS)
September 24, 2019 Filing 23 ANSWER to Complaint by Atlas Medstaff LLC (Whaley, Michael)
September 23, 2019 Filing 22 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent AMN Healthcare, Inc., Other Affiliate AMN Healthcare Services, Inc. for Medefis, Inc.. by Attorney Michael T. Hilgers on behalf of Plaintiffs Medefis, Inc., AMN Healthcare, Inc., AMN Healthcare Services, Inc..(Hilgers, Michael)
September 17, 2019 TEXT RECEIPT number 8053376, in the amount of $ 200,175.14 per order #21 by Plaintiff Medefis, Inc.. (ADB)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER - Plaintiff Medefis' Amended Motion for Leave to Deposit Funds in the Court's Registry (Filing No. #20 ) is granted. On or before September 20, 2019, Medefis shall deposit the proceeds related to Meridian's contracts in the amount of $200,175.14 with the Clerk of the Court for the United States District Court for the District of Nebraska. The Clerk is directed to deposit the aforementioned funds into an interest-bearing account until further order of this Court under 28 U.S.C. 2041 and NECivR 67.1. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (E-mailed to Finance)(LKO)
September 17, 2019 Filing 20 AMENDED MOTION for Leave to Deposit Funds in the Court's Registry by Attorney Michael T. Hilgers on behalf of Plaintiff Medefis, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hilgers, Michael)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TEXT ORDER granting #18 Motion to Extend. Medefis shall have an extension of time to September 20, 2019, to deposit the proceeds related to Meridian's contracts with the Clerk of the Court for the United States District Court for the District of Nebraska. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (SMN)
September 11, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Extend Deadline to Deposit by Attorney Michael T. Hilgers on behalf of Plaintiff Medefis, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hilgers, Michael)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: Plaintiff Medefis' Motion for Leave to Deposit Funds (Filing No. #15 ) is granted. All parties named in this lawsuit and claiming an interest in the proceeds related to Medefis' services provided to hospitals are enjoined from taking any action against Medefis arising out of or relating to the proceeds at issue here or the facts forming the basis of this lawsuit. On or before September 16, 2019, Medefis shall deposit the proceeds related to Meridians contracts in the agreed amount of $27,383.50 with the Clerk of the Court for the United States District Court for the District of Nebraska. The Clerk is directed to deposit the aforementioned funds into an interest- bearing account until further order of this Court under 28 U.S.C. 2041 and NECivR 67.1. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (E-mailed to Finance)(TCL)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ORDER granting #13 Motion to Restrict pursuant to the E-Government Act. Access to Plaintiff's Exhibit 1 #14 shall remain restricted to case participants and court users. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (SMN)
September 5, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Deposit Funds in the Court's Registry by Attorney Michael T. Hilgers on behalf of Plaintiff Medefis, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hilgers, Michael)
September 5, 2019 Filing 14 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT regarding MOTION to Restrict pursuant to the E-Government Act #13 ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). - by Attorney Michael T. Hilgers on behalf of Plaintiff Medefis, Inc..(Hilgers, Michael) Modified on 9/6/2019 to correct docket text to reflect that the entry is a restricted document per MDN chambers(TCL).
September 5, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Restrict pursuant to the E-Government Act by Attorney Michael T. Hilgers on behalf of Plaintiff Medefis, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of D. Jack)(Hilgers, Michael)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER - The Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, ECF No. #11 , complies with the requirements of Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i). In accordance with the notice, Plaintiff's Complaint against Defendant Complete Business SolutionsGroup, Inc. is dismissed without prejudice. Ordered by Senior Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (LKO)
September 5, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant Complete Business SolutionsGroup, Inc. by Attorney Michael T. Hilgers on behalf of Plaintiff MEDEFIS, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hilgers, Michael) Modified on 9/5/2019 to reflect as a motion per MDN chambers (LKO).
August 28, 2019 Filing 10 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Plaintiff MEDEFIS, Inc.. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (LKO)
August 28, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to defendants Atlas Medstaff LLC, Complete Business Solutionsgroup, Inc, HMF Capital Group, Inc., P2BInvestor, Inc., and Silver Cup Funding LLC. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LKO)
August 28, 2019 Filing 8 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Dallin R. Jack has not registered for the system or paid the biennial assessment. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LKO)
August 28, 2019 Filing 7 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Senior Judge Laurie Smith Camp and Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LKO)
August 27, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Requested as to Silver Cup Funding LLC regarding Complaint #1 . (Hilgers, Michael)
August 27, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Requested as to P2Binvestor, Inc. regarding Complaint #1 . (Hilgers, Michael)
August 27, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Requested as to HMF Capital Group, Inc. regarding Complaint #1 . (Hilgers, Michael)
August 27, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Requested as to Complete Business Solutionsgroup, Inc. regarding Complaint #1 . (Hilgers, Michael)
August 27, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Requested as to Atlas Medstaff LLC regarding Complaint #1 . (Hilgers, Michael)
August 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Interpleader against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-4006507), by Attorney Michael T. Hilgers on behalf of MEDEFIS, Inc.(Hilgers, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Medefis, Inc. v. Atlas Medstaff LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HMF Capital Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Complete Business Solutionsgroup, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Silver Cup Funding LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlas Medstaff LLC
Represented By: Michael J. Whaley
Represented By: Henry L. Wiedrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P2BInvestor, Inc.
Represented By: Glenn H. Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MEDEFIS, Inc.
Represented By: Michael T. Hilgers
Represented By: Dallin R. Jack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?