Leslie v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
Plaintiff: Barbara Leslie
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Case Number: 8:2019cv00381
Filed: August 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Bataillon
Referring Judge: Cheryl R Zwart
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Service of Defendant's First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents by Attorney David J. Schmitt on behalf of Defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company (Schmitt, David)
October 11, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent Union Pacific Corporation for Union Pacific Railroad Company. by Attorney David J. Schmitt on behalf of Defendants Union Pacific Railroad Company, Union Pacific Corporation.(Schmitt, David)
October 11, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Amended Complaint #2 and Jury Demand by Union Pacific Railroad Company (Schmitt, David)
October 3, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company on 9/23/2019. (Sassaman, Shawn)
September 11, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued (COPY) as to defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company regarding Amended Complaint #2 . YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (MLF)
September 11, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Requested as to regarding Amended Complaint #2 . (Sassaman, Shawn)
August 29, 2019 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon and Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LKO)
August 29, 2019 Filing 2 AMENDED COMPLAINT with with jury demand against Defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company, by Attorney Shawn M. Sassaman on behalf of Barbara Leslie(Sassaman, Shawn)
August 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Union Pacific Railroad Company ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-4007937), by Attorney Shawn M. Sassaman on behalf of Barbara Leslie (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sassaman, Shawn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leslie v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Leslie
Represented By: Shawn M. Sassaman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?