Aidarex Pharmaceuticals, LLC v. Stephens Pharmacy Management, LLC et al
Plaintiff: AIDAREX PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC
Defendant: A-S MEDICATION SOLUTIONS, LLC and DOES 1-50, Does 1-50, STEPHENS PHARMACY MANAGEMENT, LLC and A-S Medication Solutions, LLC
Case Number: 8:2019cv00384
Filed: September 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Susan M Bazis
Referring Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2019 Filing 17 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Attorney Daniel J. Epstein on behalf of Plaintiff Aidarex Pharmaceuticals, LLC.(Epstein, Daniel)
October 3, 2019 Filing 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 of A-S Medication Solutions, LLC by Attorney Michael F. Coyle on behalf of Defendant A-S Medication Solutions, LLC.(Coyle, Michael)
October 3, 2019 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 of Stephens Pharmacy Management, LLC by Attorney Michael F. Coyle on behalf of Defendant Stephens Pharmacy Management, LLC.(Coyle, Michael)
October 1, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant A-S Medication Solutions, LLC on 9/9/2019. (Epstein, Daniel)
October 1, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon Stephens Pharmacy Management, LLC, defendant Aidarex Pharmaceuticals, LLC on 9/9/2019. (Epstein, Daniel)
October 1, 2019 Filing 12 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Stephens Pharmacy Management, LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(ADB)
October 1, 2019 Filing 11 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant A-S Medication Solutions, LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(ADB)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (ADB)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER : Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 10/31/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (ADB)
September 30, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with with jury demand by A-S Medication Solutions, LLC, Stephens Pharmacy Management, LLC (Coyle, Michael)
September 19, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Daniel J. Epstein on behalf of Plaintiff Aidarex Pharmaceuticals, LLC.(Epstein, Daniel)
September 5, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to defendant A-S Medication Solutions, LLC, Stephens Pharmacy Management, LLC. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (TCL)
September 5, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Requested as to on A-S Medication Solutions, LLC regarding Complaint #1 . (Epstein, Daniel)
September 5, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Requested as to on Stephens Pharmacy Management, LLC regarding Complaint #1 . (Epstein, Daniel)
September 4, 2019 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Plaintiff Aidarex Pharmaceuticals, LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (KLF)
September 4, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Senior Judge Laurie Smith Camp and Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (KLF)
September 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against AIDAREX PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-4010577)AIDAREX PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC(Epstein, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aidarex Pharmaceuticals, LLC v. Stephens Pharmacy Management, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A-S MEDICATION SOLUTIONS, LLC and DOES 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEPHENS PHARMACY MANAGEMENT, LLC
Represented By: Michael F. Coyle
Represented By: Jacqueline M. DeLuca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A-S Medication Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Michael F. Coyle
Represented By: Jacqueline M. DeLuca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AIDAREX PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC
Represented By: Daniel J. Epstein
Represented By: Joel M. Carney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?