Ollberding v. Goodwill Industries, Inc.
Plaintiff: Tiara V. Ollberding
Defendant: Goodwill Industries, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2019cv00400
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Susan M Bazis
Referring Judge: Robert F Rossiter
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2019 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Marcia A. Washkuhn on behalf of Defendant Goodwill Industries, Inc..(Washkuhn, Marcia)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (TCL)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER - Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 11/12/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (TCL)
October 10, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Meaghan M. Gandy on behalf of Defendant Goodwill Industries, Inc. (Gandy, Meaghan)
October 9, 2019 Filing 7 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint with with jury demand by Goodwill Industries, Inc. (Washkuhn, Marcia)
September 20, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Goodwill Industries, Inc. on 9/20/2019. (Lutz-Priefert, Zachary)
September 11, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued (COPY) as to defendant Goodwill Industries, Inc. regarding Complaint #1 . YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (SLP)
September 11, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Requested as to Goodwill Industries, Inc. regarding Complaint #1 . (Lutz-Priefert, Zachary)
September 11, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Requested as to Goodwill Industries, Inc. regarding Complaint #1 . (Lutz-Priefert, Zachary)
September 10, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (KLF)
September 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Goodwill Industries, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-4014982), by Attorney Zachary W. Lutz-Priefert on behalf of Tiara V Ollberding(Lutz-Priefert, Zachary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ollberding v. Goodwill Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goodwill Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Marcia A. Washkuhn
Represented By: Meaghan M. Gandy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiara V. Ollberding
Represented By: Zachary W. Lutz-Priefert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?