Hillesheim v. Beekman Street Partners L.P.
Plaintiff: Zach Hillesheim
Defendant: Beekman Street Partners L.P.
Case Number: 8:2019cv00402
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Referring Judge: Michael D Nelson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER granting #9 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. Defendant shall have an extension of time to December 6, 2019, to file an answer or other responsive pleading to the Complaint. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (SMN)
November 7, 2019 Filing 9 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Sara A. McCue on behalf of Defendant Beekman Street Partners L.P..(McCue, Sara)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting #6 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. Defendant shall have an extension of time to November 7, 2019, to file an answer or other responsive pleading to the Complaint. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (SMN)
October 7, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Scott P. Moore on behalf of Defendant Beekman Street Partners L.P. (Moore, Scott)
October 7, 2019 Filing 6 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Sara A. McCue on behalf of Defendant Beekman Street Partners L.P..(McCue, Sara)
September 23, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Beekman Street Partners L.P. on 9/17/2019. (KLF)
September 10, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to defendant Beekman Street Partners L.P. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (KLF)
September 10, 2019 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Senior Judge Laurie Smith Camp and Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (KLF)
September 10, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Requested as to Beekman Street Partners L.P. regarding Complaint #1 . (Browne, Padraigin)
September 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Beekman Street Partners L.P. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-4015302), by Attorney Padraigin L. Browne on behalf of Zach Hillesheim (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Browne, Padraigin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hillesheim v. Beekman Street Partners L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zach Hillesheim
Represented By: Padraigin L. Browne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beekman Street Partners L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?