CRW Mechanical Consulting and Fabrication, LLC v. Sandine et al
Plaintiff: CRW Mechanical Consulting & Fabrication, LLC
Defendant: AFS Fabribation, LLC and Aaron Sandine
Case Number: 8:2019cv00407
Filed: September 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2019 Filing 29 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Raymond R. Aranza on behalf of Defendant AFS Fabrication, LLC, Counter Claimant AFS Fabrication, LLC.(Aranza, Raymond)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (TCL)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 SCHEDULING ORDER - Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 12/2/2019.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (TCL)
October 30, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Related Case by Attorney Katherine A. McNamara on behalf of Plaintiff CRW Mechanical Consulting and Fabrication, LLC (McNamara, Katherine)
October 29, 2019 Filing 25 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant AFS Fabrication, LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(CS)
October 28, 2019 Filing 24 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against CRW Mechanical Consulting and Fabrication, LLC regarding Complaint, #1 filed by CRW Mechanical Consulting and Fabrication, LLC by Aaron F. Sandine (Aranza, Raymond)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Defendants' Motion to Remand (Filing #13 ) is denied. Plaintiff's Motion for Order of Immediate Attachment (Filing #8 ) is denied. Ordered by Judge Brian C. Buescher. (LKO)
October 10, 2019 Filing 22 TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Brian C. Buescher regarding on MOTION for Order of Immediate Attachment #8 and MOTION to Remand #15 . Motion Hearing held on 10/10/19 in Omaha. Evidence by the Plaintiff and Defendant. Motion to Remand #15 is denied and Motion for Order of Immediate Attachment #8 is under advisement. Order forthcoming regarding both motions. Courtroom Deputy: Laura Coyle; Court Reporter: Rogene Schroder; Appearance for Plaintiffs: Katherine A. McNamara; Appearance for Defendant: Raymond R. Aranza; Time Start: 11:02 a.m.; Time Stop: 11:39 a.m.; Time in Courts: 37 minutes; (LAC)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 TEXT ORDER granting #19 Motion to Restrict pursuant to the E-Government Act. Access to Filing #15 and Filing #17 shall be restricted. Ordered by Judge Brian C. Buescher. (LAC)
October 9, 2019 Filing 20 BRIEF in opposition to MOTION for Immediate Order of Attachment #8 by Attorney Raymond R. Aranza on behalf of Defendant Aaron F. Sandine.(Aranza, Raymond)
October 9, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Restrict pursuant to the E-Government Act by Attorney Katherine A. McNamara on behalf of Plaintiff CRW Mechanical Consulting and Fabrication, LLC.(McNamara, Katherine)
October 9, 2019 Filing 18 BRIEF in opposition to MOTION to Remand #13 by Attorney Katherine A. McNamara on behalf of Plaintiff CRW Mechanical Consulting and Fabrication, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(McNamara, Katherine)
October 9, 2019 Filing 17 RESTRICTED DECLARATION regarding Order Setting Hearing on Motion,, #16 by Attorney Raymond R. Aranza on behalf of Defendant Aaron F. Sandine.(Aranza, Raymond) Modified on 10/10/2019 to restrict per Text Order 21. (LAC).
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER that this matter is set for hearing on Thursday, October 10, 2019 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom No. 1, Roman L. Hruska U.S. Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, Nebraska. The parties are FURTHER ORDERED to be prepared to address the applicability of Neb. Rev. Stat. 25-1001 et. seq. to attachment of money located in a bank account. Evidence the parties wish the Court to consider at this hearing must be filed and submitted via affidavit or declaration by at least 9:00 a.m. on Thursday, October 10, 2019. Ordered by Judge Brian C. Buescher. (LAC)
October 8, 2019 Filing 15 RESTRICTED DECLARATION regarding Brief #14 , MOTION to Remand #13 by Attorney Raymond R. Aranza on behalf of Defendant Aaron F. Sandine.(Aranza, Raymond). ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). Modified on 10/10/2019 to restrict per Text Order 21. (LAC).
October 8, 2019 Filing 14 BRIEF in support of MOTION to Remand #13 by Attorney Raymond R. Aranza on behalf of Defendant Aaron F. Sandine.(Aranza, Raymond)
October 8, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Remand by Attorney Raymond R. Aranza on behalf of Defendant Aaron F. Sandine.(Aranza, Raymond)
October 7, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Service on Defendants of Plaintiff's Motion for Immediate Order of Attachment, Brief, and Index of Evidence in Support of Same by Attorney Katherine A. McNamara on behalf of Plaintiff CRW Mechanical Consulting and Fabrication, LLC (McNamara, Katherine)
October 7, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant AFS Fabrication, LLC on 9/28/2019. (Futhey, Robert)
October 4, 2019 Filing 10 INDEX in support of MOTION for Immediate Order of Attachment #8 by Attorney Katherine A. McNamara on behalf of Plaintiff CRW Mechanical Consulting and Fabrication, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(McNamara, Katherine)
October 4, 2019 Filing 9 BRIEF in support of MOTION for Immediate Order of Attachment #8 by Attorney Katherine A. McNamara on behalf of Plaintiff CRW Mechanical Consulting and Fabrication, LLC.(McNamara, Katherine)
October 4, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Immediate Order of Attachment by Attorney Katherine A. McNamara on behalf of Plaintiff CRW Mechanical Consulting and Fabrication, LLC.(McNamara, Katherine)
September 16, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to defendant AFS Fabrication, LLC, Aaron F. Sandine. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (TCL) Modified on 9/18/2019 to correct party names (SLP).
September 16, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Requested as to regarding Complaint #1 . (Futhey, Robert)
September 16, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Requested as to regarding Complaint #1 . (Futhey, Robert)
September 16, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Katherine A. McNamara on behalf of Plaintiff CRW Mechanical Consulting and Fabrication, LLC (McNamara, Katherine) Modified on 9/18/2019 to correct party names (SLP).
September 16, 2019 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge Brian C. Buescher and Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (TCL)
September 13, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Robert W. Futhey on behalf of Plaintiff CRW Mechanical Consulting and Fabrication, LLC.(Futhey, Robert) Modified on 9/18/2019 to correct party names (SLP).
September 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-4018459), by Attorney Robert W. Futhey on behalf of CRW Mechanical Consulting and Fabrication, LLC(Futhey, Robert) Modified on 9/18/2019 to correct party names (SLP).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CRW Mechanical Consulting and Fabrication, LLC v. Sandine et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AFS Fabribation, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Sandine
Represented By: Raymond R. Aranza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CRW Mechanical Consulting & Fabrication, LLC
Represented By: John J. Waters, Jr.
Represented By: Robert W. Futhey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?