Webb v. State of Nebraska et al
Plaintiff: Yohan Webb
Defendant: State of Nebraska, City of Lincoln, Pete Ricketts, Jeff Bliemiester, Lancaster County, Leiron Gaylor Baird and Lincoln Police Dept.
Case Number: 8:2019cv00416
Filed: September 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Referring Judge: Richard G Kopf
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the State of Nebraska and Pete Ricketts, in his official capacity as Governor of the State of Nebraska, are dismissed from this action based on Eleventh Amendment immunity. The Lincoln Police Department is dismissed from this action as a non-suable entity. Plaintiff shall have 30 days from today's date in which to file an amended complaint in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. Failure to file an amended complaint within the time specified by the court will result in the court dismissing this case without further notice to Plaintiff. In his amended complaint, Plaintiff must identify each defendant by name and set forth all of Plaintiff's claims (and any supporting factual allegations) against that defendant. Plaintiff should be mindful to explain in his amended complaint what each defendant did to him, when the defendant did it, and how the defendant's actions harmed him. If Plaintiff files an amended complaint, Plaintiff shall restate the allegations of the Complaint (Filing #1 ) and any new allegations. Failure to consolidate all claims into one document may result in the abandonment of claims. Plaintiff is warned that an amended complaint will supersede, not supplement, his prior pleadings. The court reserves the right to conduct further review of Plaintiff's claims pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e) and 1915A in the event he files an amended complaint. The clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline using the following text: December 2, 2019: check for amended complaint. The clerk of court is directed to send to Plaintiff a blank civil complaint form for violation of civil rights (prisoner). The clerk of the court is directed to modify the docket sheet to terminate Defendants State of Nebraska, Pete Ricketts in his official capacity only, and the Lincoln Police Department as parties to this action. Plaintiff shall keep the court informed of his current address at all times while this case is pending. Failure to do so may result in dismissal without further notice. The following thirteen motions are denied in their entirety: Filing #4 Motion to Appoint Counsel (filed 09/19/2019); Filing #5 Motion for Declaratory Judgment (filed 09/19/2019); Filing #6 Motion for Service (filed 09/19/2019); Filing #10 Motion for Copies (filed 09/20/2019); Filing #13 Motion for Leave to Amend (filed 09/27/2019); Filing #16 Motion for Copies (filed 10/04/2019); Filing #22 Motion for Order to Investigate (filed 10/15/2019); Filing #24 Motion for Copies (filed 10/15/2019); Filing #26 Motion for Copies (filed 10/17/2019); Filing #27 Motion for Payment of Filing Fee (filed 10/17/2019); Filing #29 Motion to Appoint Counsel (filed 10/24/2019); Filing #33 Motion for Waiver of Postage (filed 10/25/2019); and Filing #34 Motion for Return of Original Documents (filed 10/31/2019). Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party and as directed) (LAC)
October 31, 2019 Filing 34 MOTION to Return Pleadings on behalf of Plaintiff Yohan Webb. (LAC)
October 25, 2019 Filing 33 MOTION to Waive Return Postage Fee on behalf of Plaintiff Yohan Webb.(LAC)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER that the Plaintiff's motion for a temporary restraining order (Filing #21 ) is denied without prejudice. Plaintiff's motion for an emergency injunction (Filing #28 ) is denied without prejudice. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LAC)
October 24, 2019 Filing 31 AFFIDAVIT regarding Notice of Health Hazard #30 on behalf of Plaintiff Yohan Webb. (LAC)
October 24, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE of Health Hazard on behalf of Plaintiff Yohan Webb. (LAC)
October 24, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION to Appoint Counsel on behalf of Plaintiff Yohan Webb. (LAC)
October 24, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION for Emergency Injunction on behalf of Plaintiff Yohan Webb.(LAC)
October 17, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION for Court Order regarding filing fee on behalf of Plaintiff Yohan Webb.(LAC)
October 17, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION for Copies on behalf of Plaintiff Yohan Webb. (LAC)
October 15, 2019 Filing 25 SUPPLEMENT on behalf of Plaintiff Yohan Webb. (LAC)
October 15, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION for Copies on behalf of Plaintiff Yohan Webb.(LAC)
October 15, 2019 Filing 23 AFFIDAVIT of Yohan Webb on behalf of Plaintiff Yohan Webb. (LAC)
October 15, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION for Order on behalf of Plaintiff Yohan Webb. (LAC)
October 15, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order on behalf of Plaintiff Yohan Webb.(LAC)
October 15, 2019 TEXT ENTRY THAT PARTIAL FILING fee paid on behalf of Yohan Webb on 10/15/2019. Receipt number 8053720, in the amount of $ 4.00. (TCL)
October 11, 2019 Filing 20 CORRESPONDENCE on behalf of Plaintiff Yohan Webb. (LKO)
October 11, 2019 Filing 19 CORRESPONDENCE on behalf of Plaintiff Yohan Webb. (LKO)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER that the Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed IFP (Filing No. #2 ), is granted. The filing fee shall be collected and remitted, as funds exist, in the manner set forth in 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(2). Until the full filing fee of $350.00 is paid, the prisoner shall be obligated to pay, and the agency having custody of the prisoner shall forwardto the clerk of the court, 20 percent of the preceding month's income in such months as the account exceeds $10.00. The clerk of the court shall serve a copy of this order on the appropriatefinancial officer for Plaintiffs current institution. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party and as directed)(LAC)
October 4, 2019 Filing 17 LETTER and Clerk's response on behalf of Plaintiff Yohan Webb. (LAC)
October 4, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Copies on behalf of Plaintiff Yohan Webb. (LAC)
September 27, 2019 Filing 15 LETTER requesting forms and copies with Clerk's Office response on behalf of Plaintiff Yohan Webb. (ADB)
September 27, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Amend on behalf of Plaintiff Yohan Webb. (LAC)
September 27, 2019 Filing 12 LETTER on behalf of Plaintiff Yohan Webb.(LAC)
September 26, 2019 Filing 14 LETTER and Clerk's Response on behalf of Plaintiff Yohan Webb.(LAC)
September 26, 2019 Filing 11 PRISONER ACCOUNT CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Yohan Webb. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). (LAC)
September 20, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Copies on behalf of Plaintiff Yohan Webb. (LKO)
September 19, 2019 Filing 9 LETTER by Clerk requesting plaintiff's trust account statement from institution. Letter sent to Angie Koziol at Lancaster County Corrections. (LKO)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 GENERAL ORDER NO. 2016-02: This general order provides for the management and assignment of cases filed by a plaintiff or petitioner without counsel. This general order also includes the definition of the pro se docket, responsibilities of the pro se law clerks and scheduling and discovery requirements in pro se cases. Ordered by Senior Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(LKO)
September 19, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE by Clerk acknowledging receipt of complaint filed by a pro se party. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO)
September 19, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Service on behalf of Plaintiff Yohan Webb. (LKO)
September 19, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION Requesting (Declatory Judgment(s)) on behalf of Plaintiff Yohan Webb. (LKO)
September 19, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel on behalf of Plaintiff Yohan Webb. (LKO)
September 19, 2019 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury on behalf of Plaintiff Yohan Webb. (LKO)
September 19, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis on behalf of Plaintiff Yohan Webb. (LKO)
September 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jeff Bliemiester, City of Lincoln, Leiron Gaylor Baird, Lancaster County, Lincoln Police Dept., Pete Ricketts, and State of Nebraska filed on behalf of pro se plaintiff Yohan Webb. (LKO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Webb v. State of Nebraska et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Nebraska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Lincoln
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pete Ricketts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Bliemiester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lancaster County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leiron Gaylor Baird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln Police Dept.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yohan Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?