Thraen v. Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Violet K. Thraen
Defendant: Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company and Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company
Case Number: 8:2019cv00417
Filed: September 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Susan M Bazis
Referring Judge: Robert F Rossiter
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 FINAL PROGRESSION ORDER - Depositions due 6/19/20. The trial and pretrial conference will not be set at this time. A telephonic status conference to discuss case progression, the parties' interest in settlement, and the trial and pretrial conference settings will be held with the undersigned magistrate judge on June 26, 2020 at 3:00 p.m. Counsel shall use the conferencing instructions assigned to this case to participate in the conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LKO)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (TCL)
October 28, 2019 Filing 14 TEXT ORDER: The parties did not consent, in writing, to disposition of the case by a magistrate judge. Pursuant to NEGenR.1.4(a)(3)(C)(ii). Case reassigned to Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (ADB)
October 28, 2019 Filing 13 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting - Settlement Likely by Attorney Bonnie M. Boryca on behalf of Plaintiff Violet K. Thraen.(Boryca, Bonnie)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER granting #11 Joint Motion to Extend. The deadline for mandatory disclosures is extended to November 20, 2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRH)
October 22, 2019 Filing 11 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Extend and Joint Stipulation to Extend Time for All Parties to Serve Mandatory Disclosures requierd by Scheduling Order #7 by Attorney Matthew D. Hammes on behalf of Defendants Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company.(Hammes, Matthew)
October 4, 2019 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent Harleysville Group, Inc., Other Affiliate Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Allied Holdings, Inc. for Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company. by Attorney Matthew D. Hammes on behalf of Defendants Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company, Harleysville Group, Inc., Allied Holdings, Inc., Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company.(Hammes, Matthew)
October 4, 2019 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 of Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company by Attorney Matthew D. Hammes on behalf of Defendant Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company.(Hammes, Matthew)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LKO)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER - Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 10/28/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LKO)
September 26, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Notice of Removal Complaint regarding: Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint, #1 with Jury Demand and Demand for Place of Trial by Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company (Hammes, Matthew)
September 26, 2019 Filing 5 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Attorney Bonnie M. Boryca on behalf of Plaintiff Violet K. Thraen.(Boryca, Bonnie)
September 20, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(TCL)
September 20, 2019 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(TCL)
September 20, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (TCL)
September 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand against Violet K Thraen from District Court of Douglas County, Nebraska, Case number CI 19-1717 ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-4022202) with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney Cristina Fackler on behalf of Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Certificates of Service, #2 Exhibit B-Plaintiff's Amended Complaint)(Fackler, Cristina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thraen v. Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Violet K. Thraen
Represented By: Bonnie M. Boryca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Cristina Fackler
Represented By: Matthew D. Hammes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company
Represented By: Cristina Fackler
Represented By: Matthew D. Hammes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?