Rath et al v. General Collection Co.
Plaintiff: Lyle Rath and Judith Rath
Defendant: General Collection Co.
Case Number: 8:2019cv00437
Filed: October 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Susan M Bazis
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 JUDGMENT - Pursuant to the Order of Dismissal entered on today's date, the above- captioned case is dismissed with prejudice, with each party to pay its own attorney's fees and costs. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LKO)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF DISMISSAL - that the stipulation is approved. The above-captioned case is dismissed with prejudice, with each party to pay its own attorney's fees and costs. Judgment will be entered by separate document. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LKO)
November 15, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL with Prejudice by Attorney Christopher R. Morris on behalf of Defendant General Collection Co..(Morris, Christopher)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting #6 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by November 15, 2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRH)
October 28, 2019 Filing 6 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Christopher R. Morris on behalf of Defendant General Collection Co..(Morris, Christopher)
October 15, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant General Collection Co. on 10/9/2019. (Bruno, Jason)
October 8, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to defendant General Collection Co. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LKO)
October 8, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Requested as to Defendant regarding Complaint #1 . (Bruno, Jason)
October 8, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNED: Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LKO)
October 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against General Collection Co. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-4034669), by Attorney Jason M. Bruno on behalf of Lyle Rath, Judith Rath (Bruno, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rath et al v. General Collection Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Collection Co.
Represented By: Christopher R. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lyle Rath
Represented By: Jason M. Bruno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith Rath
Represented By: Jason M. Bruno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?