Johnson v. Small
Plaintiff: Ieasha Johnson
Defendant: Ronald Small and Great West Casualty Company
Case Number: 8:2019cv00439
Filed: October 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Susan M Bazis
Referring Judge: Robert F Rossiter
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Filing 15 TEXT ORDER regarding Application for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically #14 . Pro Hac Vice admission fee in the amount of $100.00 is refunded to the payor, Peter Hatfield, receipt number ANEDC-4039719. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS)
November 7, 2019 Filing 14 APPLICATION for Refund of pro hac vice admission fee paid electronically by Attorney Peter Hatfield on behalf of Plaintiff Ieasha Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Hatfield, Peter)
October 23, 2019 Remark - Public: This case has been dismissed per the filing of the NOTICE of Case Dismissal #12 . (KLF)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER: The parties have filed a Notice of Case Dismissal #12 . Accordingly, the telephone conference regarding the motions to compel, which was scheduled to be held on 11/5/19 is canceled. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (RMW)
October 23, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Case Dismissal by Attorney Peter Hatfield on behalf of Plaintiff Ieasha Johnson (Hatfield, Peter)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER: A telephone conference regarding the motions to compel filed in this case will be held before Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis on 11/05/19 at 10:30 a.m. Case conference instructions are found at Filing No. #10 . Filed, official responses to the motions to compel are not necessary at this time. However, no later than 12:00 p.m. on 10/30/19, Great West Casualty and Ronald Small shall submit brief position statements to the Court via email at bazis@ned.uscourts.gov. A copy of this order will be emailed and mailed to Great West Casualty at the addresses shown on the certificate of service found at Filing No. #9 . Plaintiff shall also provide a copy of this order and the case conference instructions to Great West. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (RMW)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (TCL)
October 17, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Compel Great West Casualty, by Attorney Peter Hatfield on behalf of Ieasha Johnson (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Hatfield, Peter)
October 17, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4039719 by Attorney Peter Hatfield on behalf of Plaintiff Ieasha Johnson.(Hatfield, Peter)
October 16, 2019 Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #6 for attorney Peter Hatfield. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS)
October 16, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4038690 by Attorney Peter Hatfield on behalf of Plaintiff Ieasha Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Hatfield, Peter)
October 9, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Gerard F. Miles has not registered for admittance to practice or registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (KLF)
October 9, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Peter Hatfield has not registered for admittance to practice. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (KLF)
October 9, 2019 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE ELECTRONICALLY - Pursuant to NECivR 5.0.1(b), all documents submitted for filing shall be filed using the Electronic Filing System. An attorney who willfully or negligently fails as a registered attorney to electronically file documents may be ordered to show cause why the court should not impose sanctions. This notice is for your information for future filings. (KLF)
October 9, 2019 Filing 2 BRIEF in support of MOTION to Compel #1 by Attorney Peter Hatfield on behalf of Plaintiff Ieasha Johnson. (KLF)
October 9, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Compel with receipt number 8053661 in the amount of $400.00 by Attorney Peter Hatfield on behalf of Plaintiff Ieasha Johnson. (KLF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Small
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ieasha Johnson
Represented By: Peter Hatfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Small
Represented By: Gerard F. Miles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great West Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?